HI SB395 | 2019 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future SB395
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 5 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-07 - Referred to FIN, referral sheet 27
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 5 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-07 - Referred to FIN, referral sheet 27
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the exemption from conveyance tax for realty leases of less than 5 years by applying the exemption only to residential leases of 1 year or less. Effective 7/1/2050. (SD1)
Title
Relating To Conveyance Tax.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-07 | House | Referred to FIN, referral sheet 27 |
2019-03-07 | House | Pass First Reading |
2019-03-05 | House | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 125) in amended form (SD 1). |
2019-03-05 | Senate | Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 1). Ayes, 23; Aye(s) with reservations: none. Noes, 1 (Senator(s) Riviere). Excused, 1 (Senator(s) Harimoto). Transmitted to House. |
2019-03-01 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice 03-05-19. |
2019-03-01 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1). |
2019-03-01 | Senate | Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 835) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and placement on the calendar for Third Reading. |
2019-02-06 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 13 Aye(s): Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Keith-Agaran, English, Harimoto, Inouye, K. Kahele, Kanuha, Kidani, Moriwaki, Shimabukuro, Taniguchi, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Riviere ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2019-02-01 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM has scheduled a public hearing on 02-06-19 10:00AM in conference room 211. |
2019-01-24 | Senate | Referred to WAM. |
2019-01-22 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2019-01-18 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
SB395 (Carry Over) 2019-03-07 - Referred to FIN, referral sheet 27