HI SB4 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 24 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-24 - Act 73, 5/20/2013 (Gov. Msg. No. 1173).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 24 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-24 - Act 73, 5/20/2013 (Gov. Msg. No. 1173).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires all front and back seat passengers to be restrained by a seat belt assembly or child passenger restraint while the motor vehicle is being operated upon any public highway. (SB4 HD2)
Title
Motor Vehicles; Seat Belts; Passengers
Sponsors
Sen. Clayton Hee [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-05-24 | Senate | Act 73, 5/20/2013 (Gov. Msg. No. 1173). |
2013-05-24 | House | Act 073, on 5/20/2013 (Gov. Msg. No. 1173). |
2013-05-08 | Senate | Enrolled to Governor. |
2013-05-02 | House | Received notice of reconsideration, Senate agreement, and Final Reading (Sen. Com. No. 759). |
2013-05-02 | Senate | Passed Final Reading. 23 Aye(s); Aye(s) with reservations: none . 1 No(es): Senator(s) Slom. 1 Excused: Senator(s) Taniguchi. |
2013-04-30 | Senate | One Day Notice 05-02-13. |
2013-04-30 | Senate | Senate agrees with House amendments. Placed on the calendar for Final Reading on 05-02-13. |
2013-04-30 | Senate | Reconsideration of action taken on 04-11-13 in disagreeing to the House amendments. |
2013-04-16 | Senate | Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 699). |
2013-04-15 | House | House conferees appointed: Yamane, Kawakami Co-Chairs; Aquino, Cheape. |
2013-04-11 | House | Received notice of disagreement (Sen. Com. No. 607). |
2013-04-11 | Senate | Senate disagrees with House amendments. |
2013-04-11 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 487). |
2013-04-09 | House | Passed Third Reading as amended in HD 2 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0). Transmitted to Senate. |
2013-04-05 | House | Forty-eight (48) hours notice, Tuesday 04-09-13. |
2013-04-05 | House | Reported from JUD (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1486) as amended in HD 2, recommending passage on Third Reading. |
2013-04-02 | House | The committees on JUD recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 10 Ayes: Representative(s) Rhoads, Har, Belatti, Brower, Kawakami, C. Lee, Tsuji, Wooley, McDermott, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 3 Excused: Representative(s) Cabanilla, Carroll, Ito. |
2013-03-28 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by JUD on Tuesday, 04-02-13 2:00PM in House conference room 325. |
2013-03-22 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on JUD with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and McKelvey, Takumi, Woodson excused (3). |
2013-03-22 | House | Reported from TRN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1150) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to JUD. |
2013-03-13 | House | The committees on TRN recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Yamane, Ichiyama, Aquino, Hashem, Ing, Nakashima, Fukumoto; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Takumi, Yamashita. |
2013-03-08 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by TRN on Wednesday, 03-13-13 10:30AM in House conference room 309. |
2013-03-07 | House | Referred to TRN, JUD, referral sheet 30 |
2013-03-07 | House | Pass First Reading |
2013-03-05 | House | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 45). |
2013-03-05 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Third Reading. Ayes, 24; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 1 (Senator(s) Slom). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House. |
2013-03-01 | Senate | Deferred until 03-05-13. |
2013-02-28 | Senate | One Day Notice 03-01-13. |
2013-02-28 | Senate | Reported from JDL (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 528) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading. |
2013-02-20 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDL recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in JDL were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Hee, Shimabukuro, Gabbard, Ihara; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Slom. |
2013-02-15 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDL has scheduled a public hearing on 02-20-13 10:00AM in conference room 016. |
2013-02-12 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to JDL. |
2013-02-12 | Senate | Reported from TIA (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 189) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading and referral to JDL. |
2013-02-06 | Senate | The committee(s) on TIA recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in TIA were as follows: 8 Aye(s): Senator(s) English, Espero, Gabbard, Kahele, Keith-Agaran, Kouchi, Solomon, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Dela Cruz. |
2013-01-30 | Senate | The committee(s) on TIA has scheduled a public hearing on 02-06-13 1:17PM in conference room 224. |
2013-01-17 | Senate | Referred to TIA, JDL. |
2013-01-17 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2013-01-17 | Senate | Introduced. |