HI SB40 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Vetoed on July 12 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-07-12 - (S) Vetoed on 07-12-11 - Returned from the Governor without approval (Gov. Msg. No. 1347).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on July 12 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-07-12 - (S) Vetoed on 07-12-11 - Returned from the Governor without approval (Gov. Msg. No. 1347).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes a tracking system for the sale of products containing pseudoephedrine or ephedrine base. (CD1)
Title
Pseudoephedrine; Tracking
Sponsors
Sen. Rosalyn Baker [D] | Sen. Suzanne Chun Oakland [D] | Sen. William Espero [D] | Sen. Carol Fukunaga [D] |
Sen. Josh Green [D] | Sen. Les Ihara [D] | Sen. Clarence Nishihara [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-07-12 | (S) Vetoed on 07-12-11 - Returned from the Governor without approval (Gov. Msg. No. 1347). | |
2011-07-12 | (H) Vetoed (Gov. Msg. No. 1347). | |
2011-06-27 | (S) Notice of Intent to veto dated 06-27-11 (Gov. Msg. No. 1268) | |
2011-06-27 | (H) Notice of intent to veto (Gov. Msg. No. 1268) | |
2011-05-06 | (S) Enrolled to Governor. | |
2011-05-05 | (S) Received notice of passage on Final Reading in House (Hse. Com. No. 702). | |
2011-05-04 | (H) Received notice of Final Reading (Sen. Com. No. 694). | |
2011-05-03 | (H) Passed Final Reading as amended in CD 1 with none voting no (0) and Carroll, Pine excused (2). | |
2011-05-03 | (S) Passed Final Reading, as amended (CD 1). 24 Aye(s); Aye(s) with reservations: none . 1 No(es): Slom. 0 Excused: none. | |
2011-04-28 | (H) Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 05-03-11. | |
2011-04-28 | (H) Reported from Conference Committee (Conf Com. Rep. No. 25) as amended in (CD 1). | |
2011-04-28 | (S) 48 Hrs. Notice (as amended CD 1) 05-03-11. | |
2011-04-28 | (S) Reported from Conference Committee as amended CD 1 (Conf. Com. Rep. No. 25). | |
2011-04-26 | (H) The Conference Committee recommends that the measure be Passed, with Amendments. The votes were as follows: 4 Ayes: Representative(s) Yamane, Herkes, B. Oshiro, Morikawa; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Pine. | |
2011-04-26 | (S) The Conference committee recommends that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes of the Senate Conference Managers were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Green, Baker, Gabbard, Wakai; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Hee. | |
2011-04-20 | (S) Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-26-11 1:30PM in conference room 229. | |
2011-04-19 | (S) Conference committee meeting scheduled for 04-20-11 1:35PM in conference room 229. | |
2011-04-19 | (S) Received notice of change in conferees (Hse. Com. No. 656). | |
2011-04-19 | (S) Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 652). | |
2011-04-18 | (H) Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 643). | |
2011-04-18 | (H) House conferee(s) replaced: Representative(s) B. Oshiro replaced Representative(s) Keith-Agaran as Co-Chairs. | |
2011-04-18 | (H) House conferees appointed: Yamane, Herkes, Keith-Agaran Co-Chairs; Morikawa, Pine. | |
2011-04-18 | (S) Senate Conferees appointed: Green, Chair; Baker, Hee, Co-Chair(s); Gabbard, Wakai. | |
2011-04-14 | (H) Received notice of disagreement (Sen. Com. No. 604). | |
2011-04-14 | (S) Senate disagrees with House amendments. | |
2011-04-12 | (S) Deferred until 04-14-11. | |
2011-04-12 | (S) Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 398). | |
2011-04-08 | (H) Passed Third Reading as amended in HD 2 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Saiki, Takumi excused (2). Transmitted to Senate. | |
2011-04-06 | (H) Forty-eight (48) hours notice Friday, 04-08-11. | |
2011-04-06 | (H) Reported from CPC/JUD (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1430) as amended in HD 2, recommending passage on Third Reading. | |
2011-03-30 | (H) The committees on JUD recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 11 Ayes: Representative(s) Keith-Agaran, Rhoads, Brower, Cabanilla, Herkes, Luke, McKelvey, Souki, Tsuji, Fontaine, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 4 Excused: Representative(s) Carroll, Ito, B. Oshiro, Marumoto. | |
2011-03-30 | (H) The committees on CPC recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 11 Ayes: Representative(s) Herkes, Yamane, Brower, Cabanilla, Keith-Agaran, Luke, McKelvey, Souki, Tsuji, Ching, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 4 Excused: Representative(s) Carroll, Ito, B. Oshiro, Marumoto. | |
2011-03-28 | (H) Proposed draft of Bill scheduled to be heard by CPC/JUD on Wednesday, 03-30-11 2:00PM in House conference room 325. | |
2011-03-24 | (H) Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on CPC/JUD with none voting no (0) and Har, Riviere, Wooley excused (3). | |
2011-03-24 | (H) Reported from HLT (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1173) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to CPC/JUD. | |
2011-03-22 | (H) The committees on HLT recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 8 Ayes: Representative(s) Yamane, Morikawa, Jordan, Mizuno, Wooley, Pine; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Hanohano, Ching; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Belatti, C. Lee. | |
2011-03-18 | (H) Bill scheduled to be heard by HLT on Tuesday, 03-22-11 9:00AM in House conference room 329. | |
2011-03-14 | (H) Re-referred to HLT, CPC/JUD, referral sheet 37 | |
2011-03-10 | (H) Referred to PBM, JUD, referral sheet 33 | |
2011-03-10 | (H) Pass First Reading | |
2011-03-08 | (H) Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 60) in amended form (SD 2). | |
2011-03-08 | (S) Report adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). Ayes, 23; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 2 (Slom, Solomon). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House. | |
2011-03-04 | (S) 48 Hrs. Notice 03-08-11. | |
2011-03-04 | (S) Reported from JDL (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 573) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). | |
2011-03-01 | (S) The committee(s) on JDL recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in JDL were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Hee, Gabbard, Ihara; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 1 No(es): Senator(s) Slom; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Shimabukuro. | |
2011-02-25 | (S) The committee(s) on JDL deferred the measure until 03-01-11 11:00AM in conference room 016. | |
2011-02-23 | (S) The committee(s) on JDL deferred the measure until 02-25-11 11:00AM in conference room 016. | |
2011-02-20 | (S) The committee(s) on JDL has scheduled a public hearing on 02-23-11 9:00AM in conference room 016. | |
2011-02-18 | (S) Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to JDL. | |
2011-02-18 | (S) Reported from HTH/CPN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 381) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to JDL. | |
2011-02-10 | (S) The committee(s) on CPN recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in CPN were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Baker, Taniguchi, Green, Nishihara; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 3 Excused: Senator(s) Galuteria, Solomon, Slom. | |
2011-02-10 | (S) The committee(s) on HTH recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in HTH were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Green, Nishihara, Baker, Chun Oakland, Wakai; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Shimabukuro, Slom. | |
2011-01-31 | (S) The committee(s) on HTH/CPN has scheduled a public hearing on 02-10-11 8:30AM in conference room 229. | |
2011-01-21 | (S) Referred to HTH/CPN, JDL. | |
2011-01-20 | (S) Passed First Reading. | |
2011-01-20 | (S) Introduced. |