HI SB407 | 2013 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 9 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-07-09 - Act 276, 7/9/2013 (Gov. Msg. No. 1382).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Clarifies statutory provisions relating to composition and quorum of island burial councils. (CD1)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

OHA Package; Island Burial Councils; Composition

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2013-07-09SenateAct 276, 7/9/2013 (Gov. Msg. No. 1382).
2013-07-09HouseAct 276, on 7/9/2013 (Gov. Msg. No. 1382).
2013-05-07SenateEnrolled to Governor.
2013-05-02SenateReceived notice of passage on Final Reading in House (Hse. Com. No. 761).
2013-05-01HouseReceived notice of Final Reading (Sen. Com. No. 755).
2013-04-30HousePassed Final Reading as amended in CD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0).
2013-04-30SenatePassed Final Reading, as amended (CD 1). 25 Aye(s); Aye(s) with reservations: none . 0 No(es): none. 0 Excused: none.
2013-04-25HouseForty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 04-30-13.
2013-04-25HouseReported from Conference Committee (Conf Com. Rep. No. 16) as amended in (CD 1).
2013-04-25Senate48 Hrs. Notice (as amended CD 1) 04-30-13.
2013-04-25SenateReported from Conference Committee as amended CD 1 (Conf. Com. Rep. No. 16).
2013-04-22HouseThe Conference Committee recommends that the measure be Passed, with Amendments. The votes were as follows: 3 Ayes: Representative(s) Hanohano, Cullen, Fale; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Evans.
2013-04-22SenateThe Conference committee recommends that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes of the Senate Conference Managers were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Galuteria, Kidani, Keith-Agaran, Kahele; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Slom.
2013-04-18SenateConference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-22-13 2:00PM in conference room 312.
2013-04-17SenateConference committee meeting scheduled for 04-18-13 1:30PM in conference room 312.
2013-04-16SenateReceived notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 699).
2013-04-15HouseHouse conferees appointed: Hanohano, Cullen Co-Chairs; Evans, Fale.
2013-04-15HouseReceived notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 692).
2013-04-15SenateSenate Conferees appointed: Galuteria, Chair; Kidani, Keith-Agaran, Co-Chair(s); Kahele, Slom.
2013-04-11HouseReceived notice of disagreement (Sen. Com. No. 607).
2013-04-11SenateSenate disagrees with House amendments.
2013-04-11SenateReceived from House (Hse. Com. No. 522).
2013-04-09HousePassed Third Reading as amended in HD 2 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0). Transmitted to Senate.
2013-04-05HouseForty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 04-09-13.
2013-04-05HouseReported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1510) as amended in HD 2, recommending passage on Third Reading.
2013-03-27HouseThe committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 15 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Nishimoto, Johanson, Hashem, Ing, Jordan, Kobayashi, Lowen, Morikawa, Onishi, Tokioka, Woodson, Yamashita, Fukumoto, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Cullen, Takayama.
2013-03-25HouseBill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Wednesday, 03-27-13 4:45PM in House conference room 308.
2013-03-19HousePassed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0).
2013-03-19HouseReported from OMH (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1020) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN.
2013-03-13HouseThe committees on OMH recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 6 Ayes: Representative(s) Hanohano, Cullen, Evans, Lowen, Fale; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Coffman; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Kawakami, C. Lee.
2013-03-11HouseBill scheduled to be heard by OMH on Wednesday, 03-13-13 9:45AM in House conference room 325.
2013-03-07HouseReferred to OMH, FIN, referral sheet 30
2013-03-07HousePass First Reading
2013-03-05HouseReceived from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 128) in amended form (SD 1).
2013-03-05SenatePassed Third Reading, as amended (SD 1). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House.
2013-03-01Senate48 Hrs. Notice 03-05-13.
2013-03-01SenateReport adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1).
2013-03-01SenateReported from THA (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 628) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and placement on the calendar for Third Reading.
2013-02-13SenateThe committee(s) on THA recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in THA were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Galuteria, Keith-Agaran, Kidani, Shimabukuro, Solomon; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 3 Excused: Senator(s) Hee, Kahele, Slom.
2013-02-07SenateThe committee(s) on THA has scheduled a public hearing on 02-13-13 2:45PM in conference room 224.
2013-01-22SenateReferred to THA.
2013-01-22SenatePassed First Reading.
2013-01-18SenateIntroduced.

Same As/Similar To

HB221 (Same As) 2013-01-30 - The committee(s) on OMH recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.

Hawaii State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback