HI SB409 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-1)
Status: Enrolled on May 1 2019 - 75% progression
Action: 2019-05-06 - Enrolled to Governor.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Establishes an annual vehicle registration surcharge fee for electric vehicles and alternative fuel vehicles to be deposited into the State Highway Fund. Effective 1/1/2020. (CD1)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating To Electric Vehicles.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-06SenateEnrolled to Governor.
2019-05-02SenateReceived notice of passage on Final Reading in House (Hse. Com. No. 883).
2019-05-01HouseReceived notice of Final Reading (Sen. Com. No. 968).
2019-04-30HousePassed Final Reading as amended in CD 1 with Representative(s) Okimoto voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Lowen, Say, Thielen, Wildberger voting no (4) and none excused (0).
2019-04-30SenatePassed Final Reading, as amended (CD 1). Ayes, 21; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) J.Keohokalole, Moriwaki . 4 No(es): Senator(s) Ihara, Kim, Ruderman, L. Thielen. 0 Excused: none.
2019-04-26HouseForty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 04-30-19.
2019-04-26HouseReported from Conference Committee (Conf Com. Rep. No. 165) as amended in (CD 1).
2019-04-26Senate48 Hrs. Notice (as amended CD 1) 04-30-19.
2019-04-26SenateReported from Conference Committee as amended CD 1 (Conf. Com. Rep. No. 165).
2019-04-26HouseThe Conference Committee recommends that the measure be Passed, with Amendments. The votes were as follows: 5 Ayes: Representative(s) Aquino, Cullen, Hashimoto, Hashem, Matsumoto; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 0 Excused: none.
2019-04-26SenateThe Conference committee recommends that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes of the Senate Conference Managers were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Inouye, English, Harimoto, Shimabukuro; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Fevella.
2019-04-25SenateConference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-26-19 10:25AM in conference room 225.
2019-04-24SenateConference committee meeting scheduled for 04-25-19 10:45AM in conference room 225.
2019-04-23SenateReceived notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 849).
2019-04-22HouseHouse Conferees Appointed: Aquino, Cullen Co-Chairs; Hashimoto, Hashem, Matsumoto.
2019-04-15HouseReceived notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 901).
2019-04-15SenateSenate Conferees Appointed: Inouye Chair; English Co-Chair; Harimoto, Shimabukuro, Fevella.
2019-04-09HouseReceived notice of disagreement (Sen. Com. No. 885).
2019-04-09SenateSenate disagrees with House amendments.
2019-04-09SenateReceived from House (Hse. Com. No. 660).
2019-04-05HousePassed Third Reading with Representative(s) DeCoite, Nakamura, Okimoto, Tokioka, Wildberger voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Gates, McDermott, Todd, Ward voting no (4) and Representative(s) Eli, Mizuno, Nishimoto excused (3). Transmitted to Senate.
2019-04-04HouseDeferred one day 04-05-19.
2019-04-04HouseReported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2103), recommending passage on Third Reading.
2019-03-27HouseThe committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 12 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Cullen, Eli, Hashimoto, Kitagawa, B. Kobayashi, Matayoshi, Nishimoto, Yamashita, McDermott; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Nakamura, Wildberger; 2 Noes: Representative(s) Gates, Todd; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Holt.
2019-03-25HouseBill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Wednesday, 03-27-19 2:00PM in House conference room 308.
2019-03-20HousePassed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with Representative(s) Matsumoto, Okimoto, Perruso, Wildberger voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) McDermott, Ward voting no (2) and Representative(s) Belatti, Yamane excused (2).
2019-03-20HouseReported from TRN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1446) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN.
2019-03-15HouseThe committees on TRN recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 8 Ayes: Representative(s) Aquino, Hashimoto, Brower, Cullen, Hashem, Matayoshi, Woodson, McDermott; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 0 Excused: none.
2019-03-13HouseBill scheduled to be heard by TRN on Friday, 03-15-19 10:30AM in House conference room 423.
2019-03-07HouseReferred to TRN, FIN, referral sheet 27
2019-03-07HousePass First Reading
2019-03-05HouseReceived from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 128) in amended form (SD 2).
2019-03-05SenateReport Adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). Ayes, 22; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Gabbard, Ihara, Keith-Agaran, K. Rhoads, Riviere, Shimabukuro. Noes, 2 (Senator(s) Kim, Ruderman). Excused, 1 (Senator(s) Harimoto). Transmitted to House.
2019-02-28Senate48 Hrs. Notice 03-05-19.
2019-02-28SenateReported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 741) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 2).
2019-02-20SenateThe committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 11 Aye(s): Senator(s) Dela Cruz, English, Inouye, K. Kahele, Kanuha, Kidani, Moriwaki, Shimabukuro, Taniguchi, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Keith-Agaran ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Harimoto, Riviere.
2019-02-15SenateThe committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 02-20-19 10:05AM in conference room 211.
2019-02-14SenateReport adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.
2019-02-14SenateReported from TRS (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 357) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM.
2019-02-06SenateThe committee(s) on TRS recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in TRS were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Inouye, Harimoto, English, Shimabukuro, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none.
2019-02-01SenateThe committee(s) on TRS has scheduled a public hearing on 02-06-19 1:15PM in conference room 225.
2019-01-30SenateRe-Referred to TRS, WAM.
2019-01-24SenateReferred to TRS/PSM, WAM.
2019-01-22SenatePassed First Reading.
2019-01-18SenateIntroduced.

Subjects


Hawaii State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback