HI SB41 | 2019 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future SB41
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 17 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-12 - Re-Referred to HWN/LCA, WAM.
Pending: Senate Hawaiian Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 17 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-12 - Re-Referred to HWN/LCA, WAM.
Pending: Senate Hawaiian Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Beginning with the 2021-2023 fiscal biennium, requires the governor to include in the executive budget a minimum amount per fiscal year to be allocated to the State of Hawaii Museum of Natural and Cultural History. Appropriates funds to support the work of the State of Hawaii Museum of Natural and Cultural History. (SD1)
Title
Relating To Hawaiian Affairs.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-12 | Senate | Re-Referred to HWN/LCA, WAM. |
2019-02-12 | Senate | Report adopted, as amended (SD 1) and recommitted to HWN. |
2019-02-12 | Senate | Reported from HWN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 198) as amended (SD 1), with recommendation of recommittal to HWN. |
2019-02-07 | Senate | The committee(s) on HWN recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS and be recommitted. The votes in HWN were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Shimabukuro, K. Kahele, Ihara, J.Keohokalole; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Fevella. |
2019-02-06 | Senate | The committee(s) on HWN will hold a public decision making on 02-07-19 1:17PM in conference room 016. |
2019-01-17 | Senate | Referred to HWN. |
2019-01-17 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2019-01-17 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
SB41 (Carry Over) 2019-02-12 - Re-Referred to HWN/LCA, WAM.
Subjects
Appropriation ($)
Base Budget
Bernice Pauahi Bishop Museum
State of Hawaii Museum of Natural and Cultural History
Base Budget
Bernice Pauahi Bishop Museum
State of Hawaii Museum of Natural and Cultural History