HI SB410 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Vetoed on July 11 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-07-11 - Vetoed on 07-11-17 - Returned from the Governor without approval (Gov. Msg. No. 1268).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on July 11 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-07-11 - Vetoed on 07-11-17 - Returned from the Governor without approval (Gov. Msg. No. 1268).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Clarifies the allowable scope of collective bargaining negotiations regarding the rights and obligations of a public employer. (SB410 HD1)
Title
Relating To Collective Bargaining.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-07-11 | Senate | Vetoed on 07-11-17 - Returned from the Governor without approval (Gov. Msg. No. 1268). |
2017-07-11 | House | Vetoed (Gov. Msg. No. 1268). |
2017-06-23 | Senate | Notice of Intent to veto dated 06-23-17 (Gov. Msg. No. 1161) |
2017-06-23 | House | Notice of intent to veto (Gov. Msg. No. 1161) |
2017-04-28 | Senate | Enrolled to Governor. |
2017-04-28 | House | Received notice of reconsideration, Senate agreement, and Final Reading (Sen. Com. No. 724). |
2017-04-27 | Senate | Passed Final Reading. 25 Aye(s); Aye(s) with reservations: none . 0 No(es): none. 0 Excused: none. |
2017-04-26 | Senate | One Day Notice 04-27-17. |
2017-04-26 | Senate | Senate agrees with House amendments. Placed on the calendar for Final Reading on 04-27-17. |
2017-04-26 | Senate | Reconsideration of action taken on 04-07-17 in disagreeing to the House amendments. |
2017-04-17 | Senate | Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 587). |
2017-04-17 | House | House Conferees Appointed: Johanson, Luke Co-Chairs; Holt, Matsumoto. |
2017-04-07 | House | Received notice of disagreement (Sen. Com. No. 540). |
2017-04-07 | Senate | Senate disagrees with House amendments. |
2017-04-07 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 461). |
2017-04-06 | House | Passed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Oshiro, Saiki, Say excused (3). Transmitted to Senate. |
2017-04-06 | House | Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1685), recommending passage on Third Reading. |
2017-03-31 | House | The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 15 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Cullen, Cachola, Choy, DeCoite, Gates, Holt, Keohokalole, Kobayashi, LoPresti, Lowen, Nakamura, Tokioka, Yamashita, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Quinlan, Tupola. |
2017-03-30 | House | Bill scheduled for decision making on Friday, 03-31-17 3:15PM in conference room 308. |
2017-03-30 | House | The committee(s) on FIN recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until 03-31-17. |
2017-03-28 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Thursday, 03-30-17 2:00PM in House conference room 308. |
2017-03-24 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Aquino, DeCoite, Har, Ichiyama, C. Lee, Thielen excused (6). |
2017-03-24 | House | Reported from LAB (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1335) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN. |
2017-03-16 | House | The committees on LAB recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 6 Ayes: Representative(s) Johanson, Holt, Keohokalole, Nakashima, Yamashita, Matsumoto; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none. |
2017-03-13 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by LAB on Thursday, 03-16-17 9:00AM in House conference room 309. |
2017-03-09 | House | Referred to LAB, FIN, referral sheet 27 |
2017-03-09 | House | Pass First Reading |
2017-03-07 | House | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 155) in amended form (SD 1). |
2017-03-07 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Third Reading. Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House. |
2017-03-03 | Senate | One Day Notice 03-07-17. |
2017-03-03 | Senate | Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 874) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading. |
2017-03-01 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in WAM were as follows: 11 Aye(s): Senator(s) Tokuda, Dela Cruz, English, Galuteria, Harimoto, Inouye, K. Kahele, Riviere, Shimabukuro, Taniguchi, Wakai; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2017-02-27 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 03-01-17 9:45AM in conference room 211. |
2017-02-15 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM. |
2017-02-15 | Senate | Reported from JDL (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 250) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM. |
2017-02-09 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDL recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in JDL were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Keith-Agaran, K. Rhoads, Gabbard, Kim, L. Thielen; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2017-02-03 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDL has scheduled a public hearing on 02-09-17 9:05AM in conference room 016. |
2017-01-23 | Senate | Referred to JDL, WAM. |
2017-01-23 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2017-01-20 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
HB232 (Same As) 2017-03-22 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.