HI SB410 | 2019 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future SB410
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-0)
Status: Introduced on January 18 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-08 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to JDC/WAM.
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 18 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-08 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to JDC/WAM.
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Increases the penalties for those who violate the pedestrians' right-of-way in crosswalks.
Title
Relating To The Traffic Code.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-08 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to JDC/WAM. |
2019-02-08 | Senate | Reported from TRS (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 115) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading and referral to JDC/WAM. |
2019-02-04 | Senate | The committee(s) on TRS recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in TRS were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Inouye, English, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Harimoto, Shimabukuro. |
2019-01-30 | Senate | The committee(s) on TRS has scheduled a public hearing on 02-04-19 1:15PM in conference room 225. |
2019-01-24 | Senate | Referred to TRS, JDC/WAM. |
2019-01-22 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2019-01-18 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
SB410 (Carry Over) 2019-02-08 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to JDC/WAM.
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=SB&billnumber=410&year=2019 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2019/bills/SB410_.HTM |