HI SB412 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 5 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-04-26 - Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-26-19 1:45PM in conference room 225.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Makes an application for voter registration, including an affidavit, part of all driver's license and identification card applications. Automatically registers each applicant who elects to register for voting unless the applicant affirmatively declines to be registered to vote. Requires sharing of information among the counties, DOT, and election personnel. (SB412 HD1)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating To Voting.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-26SenateConference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-26-19 1:45PM in conference room 225.
2019-04-25SenateConference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-26-19 10:15AM in conference room 225.
2019-04-23SenateConference committee meeting scheduled for 04-25-19 10:30AM in conference room 225.
2019-04-23SenateReceived notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 826).
2019-04-22HouseHouse Conferees Appointed: C. Lee, Cullen Co-Chairs; Thielen.
2019-04-18HouseReceived notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 918).
2019-04-18SenateSenate Conferees Appointed: Inouye Chair; K. Rhoads, K. Kahele Co-Chairs; Kim, Fevella.
2019-04-11HouseReceived notice of disagreement (Sen. Com. No. 893).
2019-04-11SenateSenate disagrees with House amendments.
2019-04-11SenateReceived from House (Hse. Com. No. 736).
2019-04-09HousePassed Third Reading with Representative(s) Okimoto voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) McDermott, Ward voting no (2) and none excused (0). Transmitted to Senate.
2019-04-05HouseReported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2181), recommending passage on Third Reading.
2019-04-03HouseThe committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 13 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Cullen, Eli, Gates, Hashimoto, Kitagawa, B. Kobayashi, Matayoshi, Nakamura, Todd, Wildberger, Yamashita, McDermott; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Holt, Nishimoto.
2019-04-01HouseBill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Wednesday, 04-03-19 2:00PM in House conference room 308.
2019-03-21HousePassed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Belatti, Cabanilla Arakawa, Holt, Tokioka, Yamane excused (5).
2019-03-21HouseReported from JUD (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1518) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN.
2019-03-18HouseThe committees on JUD recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 8 Ayes: Representative(s) C. Lee, San Buenaventura, Brower, Creagan, Morikawa, Takayama, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Say; Noes: none; and 3 Excused: Representative(s) Lowen, McKelvey, Yamane.
2019-03-11HouseBill scheduled for decision making on Monday, 03-18-19 2:00PM in conference room 325.
2019-03-11HouseThe committee(s) on JUD recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until 03-18-19.
2019-03-08HouseBill scheduled to be heard by JUD on Monday, 03-11-19 2:00PM in House conference room 325.
2019-03-07HouseReferred to JUD, FIN, referral sheet 27
2019-03-07HousePass First Reading
2019-03-05HouseReceived from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 130) in amended form (SD 2).
2019-03-05SenateReport adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). Ayes, 24; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 1 (Senator(s) Harimoto). Transmitted to House.
2019-03-01Senate48 Hrs. Notice 03-05-19.
2019-03-01SenateReported from JDC/WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1144) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 2).
2019-02-26SenateThe committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 9 Aye(s): Senator(s) Dela Cruz, English, Harimoto, Kanuha, Kidani, Moriwaki, Shimabukuro, Taniguchi, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 4 Excused: Senator(s) Keith-Agaran, Inouye, K. Kahele, Riviere.
2019-02-26SenateThe committee(s) on JDC recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in JDC were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) K. Rhoads, Wakai, Gabbard, Kim, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none.
2019-02-21SenateThe committee(s) on JDC/WAM will hold a public decision making on 02-26-19 10:00AM in conference room 211.
2019-02-15SenateReport adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to JDC/WAM.
2019-02-15SenateReported from TRS (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 411) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to JDC/WAM.
2019-02-06SenateThe committee(s) on TRS recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in TRS were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Inouye, Harimoto, English, Shimabukuro, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none.
2019-02-01SenateThe committee(s) on TRS has scheduled a public hearing on 02-06-19 1:15PM in conference room 225.
2019-01-24SenateReferred to TRS, JDC/WAM.
2019-01-22SenatePassed First Reading.
2019-01-18SenateIntroduced.

Same As/Similar To

HB1203 (Same As) 2019-01-28 - Referred to JUD, referral sheet 6

Subjects


Hawaii State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback