HI SB414 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Passed on July 12 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-12 - Became law without the Governor's signature, Act 281, 07/10/2019, (Gov. Msg. No. 1401).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Passed on July 12 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-12 - Became law without the Governor's signature, Act 281, 07/10/2019, (Gov. Msg. No. 1401).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Creates procedural and administrative requirements for law enforcement agencies for eyewitness identifications of suspects in criminal investigations. Effective 6/1/2020. (CD1)
Title
Relating To Criminal Procedure.
Sponsors
Sen. Karl Rhoads [D] | Sen. Rosalyn Baker [D] | Sen. Stanley Chang [D] | Sen. Gil Keith-agaran [D] |
Sen. Clarence Nishihara [D] | Sen. Maile Shimabukuro [D] | Sen. Laura Thielen [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-07-12 | Senate | Became law without the Governor's signature, Act 281, 07/10/2019, (Gov. Msg. No. 1401). |
2019-07-12 | House | Became law without the Governor's signature, Act 281, 07/10/2019, (Gov. Msg. No. 1401). |
2019-05-06 | Senate | Enrolled to Governor. |
2019-05-02 | Senate | Received notice of passage on Final Reading in House (Hse. Com. No. 883). |
2019-05-01 | House | Received notice of Final Reading (Sen. Com. No. 968). |
2019-04-30 | Senate | Passed Final Reading, as amended (CD 1). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . 0 No(es): none. 0 Excused: none. |
2019-04-30 | House | Passed Final Reading as amended in CD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Okimoto voting no (1) and none excused (0). |
2019-04-25 | House | Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 04-30-19. |
2019-04-25 | House | Reported from Conference Committee (Conf Com. Rep. No. 33) as amended in (CD 1). |
2019-04-25 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice (as amended CD 1) 04-30-19. |
2019-04-25 | Senate | Reported from Conference Committee as amended CD 1 (Conf. Com. Rep. No. 33). |
2019-04-23 | House | The Conference Committee recommends that the measure be Passed, with Amendments. The votes were as follows: 4 Ayes: Representative(s) C. Lee, Brower, Morikawa, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Say. |
2019-04-23 | Senate | The Conference committee recommends that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes of the Senate Conference Managers were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) K. Rhoads, Wakai, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Gabbard. |
2019-04-18 | Senate | Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-23-19 3:02PM in conference room 325. |
2019-04-17 | Senate | Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-18-19 3:40PM in conference room 325. |
2019-04-16 | Senate | Conference committee meeting scheduled for 04-17-19 4:30PM in conference room 325. |
2019-04-15 | Senate | Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 809). |
2019-04-15 | House | House Conferees Appointed: C. Lee Chair; Brower, Morikawa, Say, Thielen. |
2019-04-12 | House | Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 899). |
2019-04-12 | Senate | Senate Conferees Appointed: K. Rhoads Chair; Gabbard, Wakai, Fevella. |
2019-04-05 | House | Received notice of disagreement (Sen. Com. No. 685). |
2019-04-05 | Senate | Senate disagrees with House amendments. |
2019-04-05 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 578). |
2019-04-04 | House | Passed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) DeCoite, Har, Okimoto voting no (3) and Representative(s) Nishimoto, Quinlan excused (2). Transmitted to Senate. |
2019-04-03 | House | Deferred one day 04-04-19. |
2019-04-01 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1; placed on the calendar for Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Hashem, McKelvey, Saiki, Todd excused (4). |
2019-04-01 | House | Reported from JUD (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1920) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and placement on the calendar for Third Reading. |
2019-03-15 | House | The committees on JUD recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 9 Ayes: Representative(s) C. Lee, San Buenaventura, Brower, Creagan, Lowen, Morikawa, Takayama, Yamane, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) McKelvey, Say. |
2019-03-14 | House | Bill scheduled for decision making on Friday, 03-15-19 2:00PM in conference room 325. |
2019-03-14 | House | The committee(s) on JUD recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until 03-15-19 at 2:00pm. |
2019-03-12 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by JUD on Thursday, 03-14-19 2:00PM in House conference room 325. |
2019-03-07 | House | Referred to JUD, referral sheet 27 |
2019-03-07 | House | Pass First Reading |
2019-03-05 | House | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 132) in amended form (SD 1). |
2019-03-05 | Senate | Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 1). Ayes, 24; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 1 (Senator(s) Harimoto). Transmitted to House. |
2019-03-01 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice 03-05-19. |
2019-03-01 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1). |
2019-03-01 | Senate | Reported from JDC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 829) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and placement on the calendar for Third Reading. |
2019-02-21 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDC recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in JDC were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) K. Rhoads, Wakai, Gabbard; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Kim, Fevella. |
2019-02-12 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDC deferred the measure until 02-21-19 9:30AM in conference room 016. |
2019-02-06 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDC has scheduled a public hearing on 02-12-19 9:00AM in conference room 016. |
2019-01-24 | Senate | Referred to JDC. |
2019-01-22 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2019-01-18 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
HB1061 (Same As) 2019-02-14 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Aquino, Nakamura excused (2).