HI SB442 | 2019 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future SB442
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 18 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-01-28 - Re-Referred to PSM, JDC/WAM.
Pending: Senate Public Safety, Intergovernmental and Military Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 18 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-01-28 - Re-Referred to PSM, JDC/WAM.
Pending: Senate Public Safety, Intergovernmental and Military Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes the counties to adopt ordinances to legalize marijuana cultivation, possession, sale, transfer, and use, for persons over the age of twenty-one. Clarifies that medical use of cannabis laws and penal code provisions pertaining to drug and intoxicating compounds offenses do not apply to counties that have adopted ordinances legalizing marijuana and adopted administrative rules to regulate marijuana.
Title
Relating To Marijuana.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-28 | Senate | Re-Referred to PSM, JDC/WAM. |
2019-01-24 | Senate | Referred to PSM, JDC. |
2019-01-22 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2019-01-18 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
SB442 (Carry Over) 2019-01-28 - Re-Referred to PSM, JDC/WAM.
HB291 (Same As) 2019-01-22 - Referred to JUD, FIN, referral sheet 3
HB285 (Same As) 2019-04-25 - Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Thursday, 04-25-19 at 5:45PM in Conference Room 423.
HB291 (Same As) 2019-01-22 - Referred to JUD, FIN, referral sheet 3
HB285 (Same As) 2019-04-25 - Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Thursday, 04-25-19 at 5:45PM in Conference Room 423.
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=SB&billnumber=442&year=2019 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2019/bills/SB442_.HTM |