HI SB449 | 2019 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future SB449
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Introduced on January 18 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-14 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to JDC/WAM.
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 18 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-14 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to JDC/WAM.
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires the court and the prosecution to take appropriate action to ensure a prompt trial in order to minimize the length of time a child abuse victim or minor witness must endure the stress of the child's involvement in the proceedings. (SD1)
Title
Relating To Children.
Sponsors
Sen. Russell Ruderman [D] | Sen. Mike Gabbard [D] | Sen. Jarrett Keohokalole [D] | Sen. Sharon Moriwaki [D] |
Sen. Gil Riviere [D] | Sen. Maile Shimabukuro [D] | Sen. Glenn Wakai [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-14 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to JDC/WAM. |
2019-02-14 | Senate | Reported from HMS (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 367) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to JDC/WAM. |
2019-02-11 | Senate | The committee(s) on HMS recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in HMS were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Ruderman, K. Rhoads, Ihara; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Riviere, Fevella. |
2019-02-06 | Senate | The committee(s) on HMS deferred the measure until 02-11-19 2:45PM in conference room 016. |
2019-02-01 | Senate | The committee(s) on HMS deferred the measure until 02-06-19 2:45PM in conference room 016. |
2019-01-29 | Senate | The committee(s) on HMS has scheduled a public hearing on 02-01-19 2:45PM in conference room 016. |
2019-01-24 | Senate | Referred to HMS, JDC/WAM. |
2019-01-22 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2019-01-18 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
SB449 (Carry Over) 2019-02-14 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to JDC/WAM.
HB570 (Same As) 2019-01-22 - Referred to HSH, JUD, FIN, referral sheet 4
HB570 (Same As) 2019-01-22 - Referred to HSH, JUD, FIN, referral sheet 4