HI SB452 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on January 18 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-02-13 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to WAM.
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Appropriates funds to continue and expand health care apprenticeship programs at UH community colleges.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating To Apprenticeships.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-02-13SenateReport adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to WAM.
2019-02-13SenateReported from HRE (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 277) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading and referral to WAM.
2019-02-07SenateThe committee(s) on HRE recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in HRE were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Kim, Kidani, Keith-Agaran, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) K. Kahele.
2019-02-01SenateThe committee(s) on HRE has scheduled a public hearing on 02-07-19 2:50PM in conference room 229.
2019-01-28SenateRe-Referred to HRE, WAM.
2019-01-24SenateReferred to HRE/CPH, WAM.
2019-01-22SenatePassed First Reading.
2019-01-18SenateIntroduced.

Subjects


Hawaii State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback