HI SB458 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-0)
Status: Passed on June 25 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-06-25 - Act 157, on 6/21/2013 (Gov. Msg. No. 1260).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-0)
Status: Passed on June 25 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-06-25 - Act 157, on 6/21/2013 (Gov. Msg. No. 1260).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Removes the requirement that general excise tax revenues be deposited to the credit of the state educational facilities improvement special fund. Limits expenditures from the special fund to projects authorized by the legislature for fiscal years ending prior to July 1, 2016. Limits lease payments required by financing agreements paid from the special fund to those entered into prior to July 1, 2013. Repeals the special fund on July 1, 2023. (CD1)
Title
State Educational Facilities Improvement Special Fund
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-06-25 | House | Act 157, on 6/21/2013 (Gov. Msg. No. 1260). |
2013-06-25 | Senate | Act 157, 6/21/2013 (Gov. Msg. No. 1260). |
2013-05-07 | Senate | Enrolled to Governor. |
2013-05-02 | Senate | Received notice of passage on Final Reading in House (Hse. Com. No. 761). |
2013-05-01 | House | Received notice of Final Reading (Sen. Com. No. 755). |
2013-04-30 | House | Passed Final Reading as amended in CD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Har voting no (1) and none excused (0). |
2013-04-30 | Senate | Passed Final Reading, as amended (CD 1). 25 Aye(s); Aye(s) with reservations: none . 0 No(es): none. 0 Excused: none. |
2013-04-26 | House | Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 04-30-13. |
2013-04-26 | House | Reported from Conference Committee (Conf Com. Rep. No. 91) as amended in (CD 1). |
2013-04-26 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice (as amended CD 1) 04-30-13. |
2013-04-26 | Senate | Reported from Conference Committee as amended CD 1 (Conf. Com. Rep. No. 91). |
2013-04-26 | House | The Conference Committee recommends that the measure be Passed, with Amendments. The votes were as follows: 4 Ayes: Representative(s) Takumi, Luke, Nishimoto, Johanson; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2013-04-26 | Senate | The Conference committee recommends that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes of the Senate Conference Managers were as follows: 2 Aye(s): Senator(s) Tokuda, Ige; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Slom. |
2013-04-25 | Senate | Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-26-13 9:30AM in conference room 329. |
2013-04-23 | Senate | Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-25-13 2:45PM in conference room 329. |
2013-04-22 | Senate | Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-23-13 2:45PM in conference room 329. |
2013-04-18 | Senate | Conference committee meeting scheduled for 04-22-13 3:00PM in conference room 329. |
2013-04-18 | Senate | Received notice of change in conferees (Hse. Com. No. 703). |
2013-04-17 | House | House conferee(s) added: Representative(s) Takumi as Co-Chairs. |
2013-04-17 | House | Re-referred to EDN, FIN, referral sheet 57 |
2013-04-16 | Senate | Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 699). |
2013-04-15 | House | House conferees appointed: Luke Chair; Nishimoto, Johanson. |
2013-04-15 | House | Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 692). |
2013-04-15 | Senate | Senate Conferees appointed: Tokuda, Chair; Ige, Co-Chair(s); Slom. |
2013-04-11 | House | Received notice of disagreement (Sen. Com. No. 607). |
2013-04-11 | Senate | Senate disagrees with House amendments. |
2013-04-11 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 523). |
2013-04-09 | House | Passed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0). Transmitted to Senate. |
2013-04-05 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1; placed on the calendar for Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Say, Tokioka excused (2). |
2013-04-05 | House | Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1470) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and placement on the calendar for Third Reading. |
2013-04-04 | House | The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 17 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Nishimoto, Johanson, Cullen, Hashem, Ing, Jordan, Kobayashi, Lowen, Morikawa, Onishi, Takayama, Tokioka, Woodson, Yamashita, Fukumoto, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none. |
2013-04-03 | House | Bill scheduled for decision making on Thursday, 04-04-13 2:16PM in conference room 308. |
2013-04-03 | House | The committee(s) on FIN recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until 04-04-13. |
2013-04-01 | House | Proposed draft of Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Wednesday, 04-03-13 2:30PM in conference room 308. |
2013-03-25 | House | Re-referred to FIN, referral sheet 44 |
2013-03-13 | House | The committee(s) on EDN recommend(s) that the measure be deferred. |
2013-03-11 | House | The committee(s) on EDN recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until 03-13-13 at 2:00pm. |
2013-03-07 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by EDN on Monday, 03-11-13 2:00PM in House conference room 309. |
2013-03-07 | House | Referred to EDN, FIN, referral sheet 30 |
2013-03-07 | House | Pass First Reading |
2013-03-05 | House | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 136) in amended form (SD 1). |
2013-03-05 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Third Reading. Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House. |
2013-03-01 | Senate | One Day Notice 03-05-13. |
2013-03-01 | Senate | Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 791) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading. |
2013-02-21 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in WAM were as follows: 13 Aye(s): Senator(s) Ige, Kidani, Chun Oakland, Dela Cruz, English, Espero, Kahele, Keith-Agaran, Kouchi, Ruderman, L. Thielen, Tokuda, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2013-02-19 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 02-21-13 9:00AM in conference room 211. |
2013-02-07 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM. |
2013-02-07 | Senate | Reported from EDU (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 119) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM. |
2013-01-30 | Senate | The committee(s) on EDU recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in EDU were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Tokuda, Kidani, Ruderman, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Shimabukuro. |
2013-01-28 | Senate | The committee(s) on EDU deferred the measure until 01-30-13 1:20PM in conference room 414. |
2013-01-24 | Senate | The committee(s) on EDU has scheduled a public hearing on 01-28-13 1:15PM in conference room 414. |
2013-01-22 | Senate | Referred to EDU, WAM. |
2013-01-22 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2013-01-18 | Senate | Introduced. |