HI SB470 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 5 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-04-18 - Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 918).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Authorizes the use of private lands for the Ohana Zones Pilot Program. Extends the Ohana Zones Pilot Program to June 30, 2022. Extends the Emergency Department Homelessness Assessment Pilot Program and the Medical Respite Pilot Program to June 30, 2020. (SB470 HD1)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating To Homelessness.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-18HouseReceived notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 918).
2019-04-18SenateSenate Conferees Appointed: Ruderman Chair; Riviere Co-Chair; L. Thielen, Fevella.
2019-04-15SenateReceived notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 809).
2019-04-15HouseHouse Conferees Appointed: San Buenaventura, Nakamura Co-Chairs; Gates, Ward.
2019-04-11HouseReceived notice of disagreement (Sen. Com. No. 893).
2019-04-11SenateSenate disagrees with House amendments.
2019-04-11SenateReceived from House (Hse. Com. No. 739).
2019-04-09HousePassed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0). Transmitted to Senate.
2019-04-05HouseReported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2156), recommending passage on Third Reading.
2019-04-01HouseThe committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 12 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Cullen, Eli, Gates, Hashimoto, Kitagawa, B. Kobayashi, Matayoshi, Nakamura, Nishimoto, Wildberger, Yamashita; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 3 Excused: Representative(s) Holt, Todd, McDermott.
2019-03-29HouseBill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Monday, 04-01-19 2:00PM in House conference room 308.
2019-03-22HousePassed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Quinlan, Yamane excused (2).
2019-03-22HouseReported from HSH (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1619) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN.
2019-03-20HouseThe committees on HSH recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) San Buenaventura, Nakamura, B. Kobayashi, Mizuno, Say, Tokioka, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Belatti.
2019-03-15HouseBill scheduled to be heard by HSH on Wednesday, 03-20-19 8:45AM in House conference room 329.
2019-03-07HouseReferred to HSH, FIN, referral sheet 27
2019-03-07HousePass First Reading
2019-03-05HouseReceived from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 145).
2019-03-05SenateReport adopted; Passed Third Reading. Ayes, 24; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 1 (Senator(s) Harimoto). Transmitted to House.
2019-03-01SenateOne Day Notice 03-05-19.
2019-03-01SenateReported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1066) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading.
2019-02-14SenateThe committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in WAM were as follows: 12 Aye(s): Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Keith-Agaran, English, Harimoto, Inouye, Kanuha, Kidani, Moriwaki, Riviere, Shimabukuro, Taniguchi, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) K. Kahele.
2019-02-11SenateThe committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 02-14-19 10:00AM in conference room 211.
2019-02-08SenateReport adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to WAM.
2019-02-08SenateReported from HMS (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 104) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading and referral to WAM.
2019-02-01SenateThe committee(s) on HMS recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in HMS were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Ruderman, K. Rhoads, Ihara, Riviere, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none.
2019-01-29SenateThe committee(s) on HMS has scheduled a public hearing on 02-01-19 2:45PM in conference room 016.
2019-01-24SenateReferred to HMS, WAM.
2019-01-22SenatePassed First Reading.
2019-01-18SenateIntroduced.

Subjects


Hawaii State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback