HI SB48 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 25 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-06-25 - Act 158, on 6/21/2013 (Gov. Msg. No. 1261).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 25 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-06-25 - Act 158, on 6/21/2013 (Gov. Msg. No. 1261).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Removes a representative from the department of education from the membership of the aerospace advisory committee. Amends section 205A-62, HRS, to remove the department of education from the list of state agencies with responsibilities relating to marine and coastal zone management. (CD1)
Title
Department of Education; Aerospace Advisory Committee; Marine and Coastal Management
Sponsors
Sen. Jill Tokuda [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-06-25 | House | Act 158, on 6/21/2013 (Gov. Msg. No. 1261). |
2013-06-25 | Senate | Act 158, 6/21/2013 (Gov. Msg. No. 1261). |
2013-04-29 | Senate | Enrolled to Governor. |
2013-04-26 | Senate | Received notice of passage on Final Reading in House (Hse. Com. No. 749). |
2013-04-25 | House | Received notice of Final Reading (Sen. Com. No. 747). |
2013-04-25 | House | Passed Final Reading as amended in CD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and McDermott, Thielen excused (2). |
2013-04-25 | Senate | Passed Final Reading, as amended (CD 1). 24 Aye(s); Aye(s) with reservations: none . 0 No(es): none. 1 Excused: Nishihara. |
2013-04-23 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice (as amended CD 1) 04-25-13. |
2013-04-23 | House | Forty-eight (48) hours notice Friday, 04-25-13. |
2013-04-23 | House | Reported from Conference Committee (Conf Com. Rep. No. 3) as amended in (CD 1). |
2013-04-23 | Senate | Reported from Conference Committee as amended CD 1 (Conf. Com. Rep. No. 3). |
2013-04-18 | House | The Conference Committee recommends that the measure be Passed, with Amendments. The votes were as follows: 5 Ayes: Representative(s) Takumi, Hanohano, Tsuji, Ohno, Fale; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2013-04-18 | Senate | The Conference committee recommends that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes of the Senate Conference Managers were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Tokuda, Espero, Ruderman; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Green, Slom. |
2013-04-17 | Senate | Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-18-13 3:00PM in conference room 329. |
2013-04-16 | Senate | Conference committee meeting scheduled for 04-17-13 3:00PM in conference room 329. |
2013-04-16 | Senate | Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 699). |
2013-04-15 | House | Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 694). |
2013-04-15 | Senate | Senate Conferees appointed: Tokuda, Chair; Espero, Co-Chair(s); Green, Ruderman, Slom. |
2013-04-15 | House | House conferees appointed: Takumi, Hanohano, Tsuji Co-Chairs; Ohno, Fale. |
2013-04-11 | House | Received notice of disagreement (Sen. Com. No. 607). |
2013-04-11 | Senate | Senate disagrees with House amendments. |
2013-04-11 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 496). |
2013-04-09 | House | Passed Third Reading as amended in HD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0). Transmitted to Senate. |
2013-04-05 | House | Forty-eight (48) hours notice, Tuesday 04-09-13. |
2013-04-05 | House | Reported from EDB (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1484) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Third Reading. |
2013-04-02 | House | The committees on EDB recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 8 Ayes: Representative(s) Tsuji, Ward, Brower, Cachola, Ohno, Onishi, Takayama, Tokioka; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Choy. |
2013-03-28 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by EDB on Tuesday, 04-02-13 10:30AM in House conference room 312. |
2013-03-22 | House | Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on EDB with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) McKelvey, Takumi, Woodson excused (3). |
2013-03-22 | House | Reported from OMH (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1161), recommending referral to EDB. |
2013-03-20 | House | The committees on OMH recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Hanohano, Cullen, Coffman, Evans, Kawakami, Lowen, Fale; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) C. Lee. |
2013-03-18 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by OMH on Wednesday, 03-20-13 9:30AM in House conference room 325. |
2013-03-13 | House | Passed Second Reading and referred to the committee(s) on OMH with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Mizuno excused (1). |
2013-03-13 | House | Reported from EDN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 935), recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to OMH. |
2013-03-11 | House | The committees on EDN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Takumi, Ohno, Aquino, Choy, Ichiyama, Cheape, Fale; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 3 Excused: Representative(s) Hanohano, Nakashima, Takai. |
2013-03-07 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by EDN on Monday, 03-11-13 2:00PM in House conference room 309. |
2013-02-20 | House | Referred to EDN, OMH, EDB, referral sheet 27 |
2013-02-15 | House | Pass First Reading |
2013-02-14 | House | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 17). |
2013-02-14 | Senate | Passed Third Reading. Ayes, 24; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 1 (Senator(s) Shimabukuro). Transmitted to House. |
2013-02-13 | Senate | One Day Notice 02-14-13. |
2013-02-13 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading. |
2013-02-13 | Senate | Reported from EDU/PSM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 249) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading and placement on the calendar for Third Reading. |
2013-02-07 | Senate | The committee(s) on PSM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in PSM were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Espero, Galuteria, Green, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Baker. |
2013-02-06 | Senate | The committee(s) on EDU recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in EDU were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Tokuda, Kidani, Ruderman; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Shimabukuro, Slom. |
2013-02-06 | Senate | The committee(s) on PSM deferred the measure until 02-07-13 2:45PM in conference room 224. |
2013-01-30 | Senate | The committee(s) on EDU/PSM has scheduled a public hearing on 02-06-13 1:15PM in conference room 414. |
2013-01-17 | Senate | Referred to EDU/PSM. |
2013-01-17 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2013-01-17 | Senate | Introduced. |