HI SB481 | 2019 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future SB481
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Introduced on January 18 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-01 - Re-Referred to JDC/WAM.
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 18 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-01 - Re-Referred to JDC/WAM.
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Prohibits civil asset forfeiture by reason of the commission of a covered offense, to the extent of the property owner's interest, unless the covered offense is a felony for which the property owner has been convicted. Prohibits the forfeiture of an animal prior to the disposition of criminal charges. Requires the Attorney General to distribute one half of all forfeited property and the sale proceeds thereof to the Hawaii law enforcement assisted diversion program, with the remaining half to be distributed to the state general fund.
Title
Relating To Property Forfeiture.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-01 | Senate | Re-Referred to JDC/WAM. |
2019-01-24 | Senate | Referred to PSM, JDC/WAM. |
2019-01-22 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2019-01-18 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
SB481 (Carry Over) 2019-02-01 - Re-Referred to JDC/WAM.
HB748 (Same As) 2019-07-09 - Vetoed on 07-09-19 - Returned from the Governor without approval (Gov. Msg. No. 1377).
HB748 (Same As) 2019-07-09 - Vetoed on 07-09-19 - Returned from the Governor without approval (Gov. Msg. No. 1377).
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=SB&billnumber=481&year=2019 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2019/bills/SB481_.HTM |