HI SB490 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 5 2013 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-03-07 - Referred to HLT, CPC, referral sheet 30
Pending: House Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 5 2013 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-03-07 - Referred to HLT, CPC, referral sheet 30
Pending: House Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires the professional and vocational licensing division of the department of commerce and consumer affairs and the state board of nursing to collaborate with the center for nursing to enable the center to obtain nursing-related data, including but not limited to workforce data of nurses licensed in the State. Requires the professional and vocational licensing division to provide the center for nursing with various information through a memorandum of understanding. Requests completion of a center for nursing survey as part of the license renewal requirements under chapter 457, Hawaii Revised Statutes. Effective 7/1/2050. (SD2)
Title
Nursing; Center for Nursing; Department of Commerce and Consumer Affairs; Licensing
Sponsors
Sen. Rosalyn Baker [D] | Sen. Suzanne Chun Oakland [D] | Sen. Josh Green [D] | Sen. Les Ihara [D] |
Sen. Gil Keith-agaran [D] | Sen. Russell Ruderman [D] | Sen. Maile Shimabukuro [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-03-07 | House | Referred to HLT, CPC, referral sheet 30 |
2013-03-07 | House | Pass First Reading |
2013-03-05 | House | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 144) in amended form (SD 2). |
2013-03-05 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House. |
2013-02-28 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice 03-05-13. |
2013-02-28 | Senate | Reported from CPN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 522) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). |
2013-02-20 | Senate | The committee(s) on CPN recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in CPN were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Baker, Galuteria, Solomon, Wakai, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Nishihara, Taniguchi. |
2013-02-15 | Senate | The committee(s) on CPN will hold a public decision making on 02-20-13 9:30AM in conference room 229. |
2013-02-15 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to CPN. |
2013-02-15 | Senate | Reported from HRE (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 418) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to CPN. |
2013-01-31 | Senate | The committee(s) on HRE recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in HRE were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Taniguchi, Kahele, Keith-Agaran, Tokuda; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Kidani ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Ige, Slom. |
2013-01-28 | Senate | The committee(s) on HRE has scheduled a public hearing on 01-31-13 2:45PM in conference room 414. |
2013-01-22 | Senate | Referred to HRE, CPN. |
2013-01-22 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2013-01-18 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
HB654 (Same As) 2013-07-09 - Vetoed on 07-08-13 - Returned from the Governor without approval (Gov. Msg. No. 1372).