HI SB490 | 2019 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future SB490
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Introduced on January 18 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-15 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 18 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-15 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes a community food forest program in the Department of Land and Natural Resources to work collaboratively with local government and community organizations to provide sources of healthy food statewide. Takes effect 12/31/2050. (SD1)
Title
Relating To Community Food Forests.
Sponsors
Sen. Mike Gabbard [D] | Sen. Gil Keith-agaran [D] | Sen. Russell Ruderman [D] | Sen. Breene Harimoto [D] |
Sen. Les Ihara [D] | Sen. Maile Shimabukuro [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-15 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM. |
2019-02-15 | Senate | Reported from WTL/AEN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 457) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM. |
2019-02-11 | Senate | The committee(s) on WTL recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WTL were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) K. Kahele, Keith-Agaran, Riviere; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Nishihara, Fevella. |
2019-02-11 | Senate | The committee(s) on AEN recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in AEN were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Gabbard, K. Rhoads, L. Thielen; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Ruderman, Fevella. |
2019-02-07 | Senate | The committee(s) on WTL/AEN has scheduled a public hearing on 02-11-19 2:45PM in conference room 224. |
2019-01-24 | Senate | Referred to WTL/AEN, WAM. |
2019-01-22 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2019-01-18 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
SB490 (Carry Over) 2019-02-15 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.
HB237 (Same As) 2019-01-22 - Referred to AGR/WLH, FIN, referral sheet 3
HB237 (Same As) 2019-01-22 - Referred to AGR/WLH, FIN, referral sheet 3
Subjects
Appropriation ($)
Community Food Forest Program
Department of Agriculture
Department of Land and Natural Resources
Community Food Forest Program
Department of Agriculture
Department of Land and Natural Resources