HI SB493 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 5 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-04-22 - Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 951).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Prohibits a health care insurer from requiring an insured diagnosed with stage two cancer to undergo step therapy prior to covering the insured for the drug prescribed by the insured's health care provider, under certain conditions. Requires analysis and report by State Auditor to determine if federal ACA provisions or state sunrise analysis requirements have been triggered. (SB493 HD1)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating To Health Care Insurance.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-22HouseReceived notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 951).
2019-04-22SenateSenate Conferees Appointed: Baker Chair; English Co-Chair; J.Keohokalole, Fevella.
2019-04-09HouseReceived notice of disagreement (Sen. Com. No. 885).
2019-04-09SenateSenate disagrees with House amendments.
2019-04-09SenateReceived from House (Hse. Com. No. 661).
2019-04-05HousePassed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Eli, Mizuno, Nishimoto excused (3). Transmitted to Senate.
2019-04-05HouseReported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2131), recommending passage on Third Reading.
2019-03-29HouseThe committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 15 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Cullen, Eli, Gates, Hashimoto, Holt, Kitagawa, B. Kobayashi, Matayoshi, Nakamura, Nishimoto, Todd, Wildberger, Yamashita, McDermott; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 0 Excused: none.
2019-03-27HouseBill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Friday, 03-29-19 2:30PM in House conference room 308.
2019-03-22HouseReport adopted; referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Quinlan, Yamane excused (2).
2019-03-22HouseReported from CPC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1604), recommending referral to FIN.
2019-03-20HouseThe committees on CPC recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Takumi, Ichiyama, Cabanilla Arakawa, Cachola, Kong, Onishi, Matsumoto; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 4 Excused: Representative(s) Aquino, Belatti, Har, Mizuno.
2019-03-15HouseBill scheduled to be heard by CPC on Wednesday, 03-20-19 2:15PM in House conference room 329.
2019-03-15HousePassed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on CPC with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) McKelvey, Nakamura, Quinlan, Takumi excused (4).
2019-03-15HouseReported from HLT (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1378) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to CPC.
2019-03-14HouseThe committees on HLT recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Mizuno, B. Kobayashi, Belatti, Nakamura, San Buenaventura, Say, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Tokioka.
2019-03-11HouseBill scheduled to be heard by HLT on Thursday, 03-14-19 9:00AM in House conference room 329.
2019-03-11HouseRe-referred to HLT, CPC, FIN, referral sheet 30
2019-03-07HouseReferred to HLT, CPC, referral sheet 27
2019-03-07HousePass First Reading
2019-03-05HouseReceived from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 154) in amended form (SD 2).
2019-03-05SenateReport adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). Ayes, 24; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 1 (Senator(s) Harimoto). Transmitted to House.
2019-02-28Senate48 Hrs. Notice 03-05-19.
2019-02-28SenateReported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 702) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 2).
2019-02-19SenateThe committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 8 Aye(s): Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Keith-Agaran, Inouye, Kanuha, Kidani, Moriwaki, Riviere, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 5 Excused: Senator(s) English, Harimoto, K. Kahele, Shimabukuro, Taniguchi.
2019-02-15SenateThe committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 02-19-19 9:30AM in conference room 211.
2019-02-15SenateReport adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.
2019-02-15SenateReported from CPH (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 541) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM.
2019-02-11SenateThe committee(s) on CPH recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in CPH were as follows: 6 Aye(s): Senator(s) Baker, S. Chang, J.Keohokalole, Nishihara, Ruderman, L. Thielen; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Fevella.
2019-02-06SenateThe committee(s) on CPH has scheduled a public hearing on 02-11-19 9:30AM in conference room 229.
2019-01-24SenateReferred to CPH, WAM.
2019-01-22SenatePassed First Reading.
2019-01-18SenateIntroduced.

Subjects


Hawaii State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback