HI SB494 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 12 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-12 - Act 044, 06/07/2019 (Gov. Msg. No. 1145).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Makes a deposit into the emergency and budget reserve fund pursuant to article VII, section 6, of the Hawaii Constitution. Appropriates funds. (SB494 CD1)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating To The General Fund Balance.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-06-12SenateAct 044, 06/07/2019 (Gov. Msg. No. 1145).
2019-06-12HouseAct 044, on 06/07/2019 (Gov. Msg. No. 1145).
2019-05-03SenateEnrolled to Governor.
2019-05-02SenateReceived notice of passage on Final Reading in House (Hse. Com. No. 883).
2019-04-30HousePassed Final Reading as amended in CD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0).
2019-04-26HouseReceived notice of Final Reading (Sen. Com. No. 965).
2019-04-26SenatePassed Final Reading, as amended (CD 1). Ayes, 24; Aye(s) with reservations: none . 0 No(es): none. 1 Excused: Senator(s) Fevella.
2019-04-26HouseDeferred one day 04-30-19.
2019-04-24HouseForty-eight (48) hours notice Friday, 04-26-19.
2019-04-24HouseReported from Conference Committee (Conf Com. Rep. No. 9) as amended in (CD 1).
2019-04-24Senate48 Hrs. Notice (as amended CD 1) 04-26-19.
2019-04-24SenateReported from Conference Committee as amended CD 1 (Conf. Com. Rep. No. 9).
2019-04-22HouseThe Conference Committee recommends that the measure be Passed, with Amendments. The votes were as follows: 3 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Cullen, McDermott; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 0 Excused: none.
2019-04-22SenateThe Conference committee recommends that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes of the Senate Conference Managers were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Keith-Agaran, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none.
2019-04-18SenateConference committee meeting scheduled for 04-22-19 10:30AM in conference room 309.
2019-04-15HouseReceived notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 901).
2019-04-15SenateSenate Conferees Appointed: Dela Cruz Chair; Keith-Agaran Co-Chair; Fevella.
2019-04-15SenateReceived notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 807).
2019-04-12HouseHouse Conferees Appointed: Luke Chair; Cullen, McDermott.
2019-04-05HouseReceived notice of disagreement (Sen. Com. No. 685).
2019-04-05SenateSenate disagrees with House amendments.
2019-04-05SenateReceived from House (Hse. Com. No. 579).
2019-04-04HousePassed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Ward voting no (1) and Representative(s) Nishimoto, Quinlan excused (2). Transmitted to Senate.
2019-04-03HouseDeferred one day 04-04-19.
2019-04-01HousePassed Second Reading as amended in HD 1; placed on the calendar for Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Ward voting no (1) and Representative(s) Hashem, McKelvey, Saiki, Todd excused (4).
2019-04-01HouseReported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1908) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and placement on the calendar for Third Reading.
2019-03-15HouseThe committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 14 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Cullen, Eli, Gates, Hashimoto, Holt, Kitagawa, B. Kobayashi, Matayoshi, Nishimoto, Todd, Wildberger, Yamashita, McDermott; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Nakamura.
2019-03-12HouseBill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Friday, 03-15-19 2:00PM in House conference room 308.
2019-02-28HouseReferred to FIN, referral sheet 26
2019-02-14HousePass First Reading
2019-02-13HouseReceived from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 7) in amended form (SD 1).
2019-02-13SenatePassed Third Reading, as amended (SD 1). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House.
2019-02-11Senate48 Hrs. Notice 02-13-19.
2019-02-11SenateReport adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1).
2019-02-11SenateReported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 165) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and placement on the calendar for Third Reading.
2019-02-05SenateThe committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 10 Aye(s): Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Keith-Agaran, English, Inouye, K. Kahele, Kanuha, Moriwaki, Riviere, Shimabukuro, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 3 Excused: Senator(s) Harimoto, Kidani, Taniguchi.
2019-02-01SenateThe committee(s) on WAM has scheduled a public hearing on 02-05-19 10:00AM in conference room 211.
2019-01-24SenateReferred to WAM.
2019-01-22SenatePassed First Reading.
2019-01-18SenateIntroduced.

Subjects


Hawaii State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback