HI SB497 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-1)
Status: Engrossed on March 5 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-03-07 - Referred to LAB, FIN, referral sheet 27
Pending: House Labor & Public Employment Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Clarifies the grant application process requirements for organizations that may receive a grant from the State. Specifies additional grant application process requirements for nonprofit organizations. Effective 7/1/2050. (SD1)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating To Grants.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-07HouseReferred to LAB, FIN, referral sheet 27
2019-03-07HousePass First Reading
2019-03-05HouseReceived from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 156) in amended form (SD 1).
2019-03-05SenatePassed Third Reading, as amended (SD 1). Ayes, 24; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 1 (Senator(s) Harimoto). Transmitted to House.
2019-03-01Senate48 Hrs. Notice 03-05-19.
2019-03-01SenateReport adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1).
2019-03-01SenateReported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 836) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and placement on the calendar for Third Reading.
2019-02-20SenateThe committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 11 Aye(s): Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Keith-Agaran, English, Inouye, K. Kahele, Kanuha, Kidani, Moriwaki, Shimabukuro, Taniguchi, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Harimoto, Riviere.
2019-02-15SenateThe committee(s) on WAM has scheduled a public hearing on 02-20-19 10:00AM in conference room 211.
2019-01-24SenateReferred to WAM.
2019-01-22SenatePassed First Reading.
2019-01-18SenateIntroduced.

Subjects


Hawaii State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback