HI SB5 | 2013 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 2 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-07-02 - Act 234, on 6/27/2013 (Gov. Msg. No. 1337).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Provides several means of compensation in addition to rent reductions when the State withdraws, condemns, or takes public land leased for intensive agricultural or pastoral uses and renders the land unusable for the original purposes of the lease. (CD1)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Public Lands; Leases; Takings; Compensation

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2013-07-02HouseAct 234, on 6/27/2013 (Gov. Msg. No. 1337).
2013-07-02SenateAct 234, 6/27/2013 (Gov. Msg. No. 1337).
2013-05-07SenateEnrolled to Governor.
2013-05-02SenateReceived notice of passage on Final Reading in House (Hse. Com. No. 761).
2013-05-01HouseReceived notice of Final Reading (Sen. Com. No. 755).
2013-04-30HousePassed Final Reading as amended in CD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0).
2013-04-30SenatePassed Final Reading, as amended (CD 1). 25 Aye(s); Aye(s) with reservations: none . 0 No(es): none. 0 Excused: none.
2013-04-26HouseForty-eight (48) hours notice, Tuesday 04-30-13.
2013-04-26HouseReported from Conference Committee (Conf Com. Rep. No. 152) as amended in (CD 1).
2013-04-26Senate48 Hrs. Notice (as amended CD 1) 04-30-13.
2013-04-26SenateReported from Conference Committee as amended CD 1 (Conf. Com. Rep. No. 152).
2013-04-26HouseThe Conference Committee recommends that the measure be Passed, with Amendments. The votes were as follows: 4 Ayes: Representative(s) Wooley, Evans, Tsuji, Cheape; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Onishi.
2013-04-26SenateThe Conference committee recommends that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes of the Senate Conference Managers were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Solomon, Kouchi, Shimabukuro, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Dela Cruz.
2013-04-25SenateConference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-26-13 1:00PM in conference room 224.
2013-04-24SenateConference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-25-13 1:00PM in conference room 224.
2013-04-23SenateConference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-24-13 3:00PM in conference room 224.
2013-04-22SenateConference committee meeting scheduled for 04-23-13 3:00PM in conference room 224.
2013-04-18HouseReceived notice of change in Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 709).
2013-04-18SenateSenator(s) Kouchi replaced Senator(s) Ige as (Co-) Chair(s).
2013-04-18SenateConference committee meeting scheduled for 04-19-13 2:30PM in conference room 224.
2013-04-16HouseReceived notice of change in Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 699).
2013-04-16SenateSenator(s) Shimabukuro discharged as (Co-) Chair; Added as conferee.
2013-04-16SenateReceived notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 699).
2013-04-15HouseHouse conferees appointed: Wooley, Evans, Onishi Co-Chairs; Tsuji, Cheape.
2013-04-15HouseReceived notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 692).
2013-04-15SenateSenate Conferees appointed: Solomon, Chair; Shimabukuro, Ige, Co-Chair(s); Dela Cruz, Slom.
2013-04-11HouseReceived notice of disagreement (Sen. Com. No. 607).
2013-04-11SenateSenate disagrees with House amendments.
2013-04-11SenateReceived from House (Hse. Com. No. 488).
2013-04-09HousePassed Third Reading as amended in HD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0). Transmitted to Senate.
2013-04-05HouseForty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 04-09-13.
2013-04-05HouseReported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1574) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Third Reading.
2013-04-02HouseThe committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 15 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Nishimoto, Johanson, Cullen, Hashem, Ing, Jordan, Kobayashi, Lowen, Morikawa, Onishi, Takayama, Tokioka, Yamashita, Fukumoto; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Woodson, Ward.
2013-03-28HouseBill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Tuesday, 04-02-13 2:00PM in House conference room 308.
2013-03-28HouseRe-referred to AGR/WAL, FIN, referral sheet 45
2013-03-15HousePassed Second Reading and referred to the committee(s) on JUD with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Mizuno, Oshiro, Takai excused (3).
2013-03-15HouseReported from AGR/WAL (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 951), recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to JUD.
2013-03-11HouseThe committees on WAL recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 5 Ayes: Representative(s) Evans, Lowen, Coffman, Cullen, Fale; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 4 Excused: Representative(s) Hanohano, Kawakami, C. Lee, Thielen.
2013-03-11HouseThe committees on AGR recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 11 Ayes: Representative(s) Wooley, Onishi, Brower, Cachola, Choy, Ohno, Takayama, Tokioka, Tsuji, Cheape, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none.
2013-03-08HouseBill scheduled to be heard by AGR/WAL on Monday, 03-11-13 8:40AM in House conference room 312.
2013-03-07HouseReferred to AGR/WAL, JUD, FIN, referral sheet 30
2013-03-07HousePass First Reading
2013-03-05HouseReceived from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 46) in amended form (SD 1).
2013-03-05SenateReport adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 1). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House.
2013-03-01Senate48 Hrs. Notice 03-05-13.
2013-03-01SenateReported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 603) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 1).
2013-02-22SenateThe committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 12 Aye(s): Senator(s) Ige, Kidani, Chun Oakland, Dela Cruz, English, Espero, Kahele, Keith-Agaran, Ruderman, L. Thielen, Tokuda, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Kouchi.
2013-02-19SenateThe committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 02-22-13 9:00AM in conference room 211.
2013-02-11SenateReport adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to WAM.
2013-02-11SenateReported from WTL/AGL (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 162) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading and referral to WAM.
2013-02-05SenateThe committee(s) on WTL recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in WTL were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Solomon, Shimabukuro, Dela Cruz, L. Thielen, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Ihara, Ruderman.
2013-02-05SenateThe committee(s) on AGL recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in AGL were as follows: 6 Aye(s): Senator(s) Nishihara, Kouchi, Dela Cruz, English, L. Thielen, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Wakai.
2013-02-01SenateThe committee(s) on WTL/AGL will hold a public decision making on 02-05-13 2:46PM in conference room 229.
2013-01-29SenateThe committee(s) on WTL/AGL has rescheduled its public hearing to 01-31-13 2:00PM in conference room 229.
2013-01-28SenateThe committee(s) on WTL/AGL has scheduled a public hearing on 01-31-13 2:00PM in conference room 225.
2013-01-17SenateReferred to WTL/AGL, WAM.
2013-01-17SenatePassed First Reading.
2013-01-17SenateIntroduced.

Hawaii State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback