HI SB502 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-0)
Status: Passed on June 26 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-06-26 - Act 186, 6/25/2013 (Gov. Msg. No. 1289).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-0)
Status: Passed on June 26 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-06-26 - Act 186, 6/25/2013 (Gov. Msg. No. 1289).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes a uniform standard for disclosure for condominium projects, cooperative housing corporations, and other community associations and clarifies the types of documents that are required to be disclosed. Requires the disclosure of documents within ten days after the title report is received. Allows for the electronic receipt of documents with the buyer's consent. Effective 11/01/13. (CD1)
Title
Real Estate; Seller Disclosure; Required Documents
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-06-26 | Senate | Act 186, 6/25/2013 (Gov. Msg. No. 1289). |
2013-06-26 | House | Act 186, on 6/25/2013 (Gov. Msg. No. 1289). |
2013-04-29 | Senate | Enrolled to Governor. |
2013-04-26 | Senate | Received notice of passage on Final Reading in House (Hse. Com. No. 749). |
2013-04-25 | House | Received notice of Final Reading (Sen. Com. No. 747). |
2013-04-25 | House | Passed Final Reading as amended in CD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and McDermott, Thielen excused (2). |
2013-04-25 | Senate | Passed Final Reading, as amended (CD 1). 24 Aye(s); Aye(s) with reservations: none . 0 No(es): none. 1 Excused: Nishihara. |
2013-04-23 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice (as amended CD 1) 04-25-13. |
2013-04-23 | House | Forty-eight (48) hours notice Friday, 04-25-13. |
2013-04-23 | House | Reported from Conference Committee (Conf Com. Rep. No. 6) as amended in (CD 1). |
2013-04-23 | Senate | Reported from Conference Committee as amended CD 1 (Conf. Com. Rep. No. 6). |
2013-04-18 | House | The Conference Committee recommends that the measure be Passed, with Amendments. The votes were as follows: 3 Ayes: Representative(s) McKelvey, Kawakami, McDermott; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2013-04-18 | Senate | The Conference committee recommends that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes of the Senate Conference Managers were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Baker, Galuteria, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2013-04-17 | Senate | Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-18-13 2:45PM in conference room 016. |
2013-04-16 | Senate | Conference committee meeting scheduled for 04-17-13 1:30PM in conference room 016. |
2013-04-16 | Senate | Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 699). |
2013-04-15 | House | House conferees appointed: McKelvey Chair; Kawakami, McDermott. |
2013-04-15 | House | Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 692). |
2013-04-15 | Senate | Senate Conferees appointed: Baker, Chair; Galuteria, Slom. |
2013-04-11 | House | Received notice of disagreement (Sen. Com. No. 608). |
2013-04-11 | Senate | Senate disagrees with House amendments. |
2013-04-09 | Senate | Deferred until 04-11-13. |
2013-04-05 | Senate | Deferred until 04-09-13. |
2013-04-04 | Senate | Deferred until 04-05-13. |
2013-04-03 | Senate | Deferred until 04-04-13. |
2013-04-02 | Senate | Deferred until 04-03-13. |
2013-04-02 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 400). |
2013-04-01 | House | Passed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and McKelvey excused (1). Transmitted to Senate. |
2013-03-28 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1; placed on the calendar for Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Belatti, C. Lee, Tokioka excused (3). |
2013-03-28 | House | Reported from CPC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1239) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and placement on the calendar for Third Reading. |
2013-03-20 | House | The committees on CPC recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 12 Ayes: Representative(s) McKelvey, Kawakami, Belatti, Brower, Cachola, Evans, Ito, C. Lee, Tsuji, Yamane, McDermott, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 3 Excused: Representative(s) Cabanilla, Carroll, Har. |
2013-03-18 | House | Bill scheduled for decision making on Wednesday, 03-20-13 2:00PM in conference room 325. |
2013-03-18 | House | The committee(s) on CPC recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until 03-20-13. |
2013-03-15 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by CPC on Monday, 03-18-13 2:30PM in House conference room 325. |
2013-03-07 | House | Referred to CPC, referral sheet 30 |
2013-03-07 | House | Pass First Reading |
2013-03-05 | House | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 151) in amended form (SD 1). |
2013-03-05 | Senate | Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 1). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House. |
2013-02-28 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice 03-05-13. |
2013-02-28 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1). |
2013-02-28 | Senate | Reported from CPN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 470) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and placement on the calendar for Third Reading. |
2013-02-13 | Senate | The committee(s) on CPN recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in CPN were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Baker, Galuteria, Nishihara, Solomon, Wakai; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Taniguchi, Slom. |
2013-01-31 | Senate | The committee(s) on CPN has scheduled a public hearing on 02-13-13 8:30AM in conference room 229. |
2013-01-22 | Senate | Referred to CPN. |
2013-01-22 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2013-01-18 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
HB138 (Same As) 2013-03-07 - Referred to CPN.