HI SB503 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Introduced on January 18 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-04-11 - Senate disagrees with House amendments.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 18 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-04-11 - Senate disagrees with House amendments.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Makes permanent the prohibition of private fees for a future transfer of real property.
Title
Real Property; Private Transfer Fees
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-04-11 | Senate | Senate disagrees with House amendments. |
2013-02-01 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to JDL. |
2013-02-01 | Senate | Reported from CPN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 18) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading and referral to JDL. |
2013-01-30 | Senate | The committee(s) on CPN recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in CPN were as follows: 6 Aye(s): Senator(s) Baker, Galuteria, Nishihara, Solomon, Taniguchi, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Wakai. |
2013-01-24 | Senate | The committee(s) on CPN has scheduled a public hearing on 01-30-13 8:30AM in conference room 229. |
2013-01-22 | Senate | Referred to CPN, JDL. |
2013-01-22 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2013-01-18 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
HB998 (Same As) 2013-04-24 - Act 042, 4/23/2013 (Gov. Msg. No. 1142).