HI SB512 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 1 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-01 - Act 065, 4/30/2013 (Gov. Msg. No. 1165).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 1 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-01 - Act 065, 4/30/2013 (Gov. Msg. No. 1165).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Provides a limited exemption to the licensing requirements for certain individuals contracted with an electric utility to work with high voltage (six hundred volts or more), who are not licensed in Hawaii but satisfy specified requirements. Sunsets June 30, 2018. (SB512 HD2)
Title
Electrical Contractors; Licensing; Exemptions; High Voltage
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-05-01 | Senate | Act 065, 4/30/2013 (Gov. Msg. No. 1165). |
2013-05-01 | House | Act 065, on 4/30/2013 (Gov. Msg. No. 1165). |
2013-04-16 | Senate | Enrolled to Governor. |
2013-04-16 | House | Received notice of reconsideration, Senate agreement, and Final Reading (Sen. Com. No. 696). |
2013-04-16 | Senate | Passed Final Reading. 25 Aye(s); Aye(s) with reservations: none . 0 No(es): none. 0 Excused: none. |
2013-04-16 | Senate | Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 699). |
2013-04-15 | House | House conferees appointed: Nakashima, C. Lee, McKelvey Co-Chairs; Yamane, Thielen. |
2013-04-15 | Senate | One Day Notice 04-16-13. |
2013-04-15 | Senate | Senate agrees with House amendments. Placed on the calendar for Final Reading on 04-16-13. |
2013-04-15 | Senate | Reconsideration of action taken on 04-11-13 in disagreeing to the House amendments. |
2013-04-11 | House | Received notice of disagreement (Sen. Com. No. 607). |
2013-04-11 | Senate | Senate disagrees with House amendments. |
2013-04-11 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 529). |
2013-04-09 | House | Passed Third Reading as amended in HD 2 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0). Transmitted to Senate. |
2013-04-05 | House | Forty-eight (48) hours notice, Tuesday 04-09-13. |
2013-04-05 | House | Reported from CPC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1485) as amended in HD 2, recommending passage on Third Reading. |
2013-04-01 | House | The committees on CPC recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 9 Ayes: Representative(s) Kawakami, Belatti, Brower, Cachola, Evans, C. Lee, Tsuji, Yamane, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 6 Excused: Representative(s) McKelvey, Cabanilla, Carroll, Har, Ito, McDermott. |
2013-03-27 | House | Bill scheduled for decision making on Monday, 04-01-13 2:25PM in conference room 325. |
2013-03-27 | House | The committee(s) on CPC recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until 04-01-13. |
2013-03-22 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by CPC on Wednesday, 03-27-13 4:00PM in House conference room 325. |
2013-03-22 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on CPC with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and McKelvey, Takumi, Woodson excused (3). |
2013-03-22 | House | Reported from LAB/EEP (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1135) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to CPC. |
2013-03-19 | House | The committees on EEP recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) C. Lee, Thielen, Coffman, Cullen, Evans, Hanohano, Kawakami; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Lowen, Fale. |
2013-03-19 | House | The committees on LAB recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 8 Ayes: Representative(s) Nakashima, Hashem, Aquino, Ichiyama, Ing, Takumi, Yamane, Yamashita; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Johanson. |
2013-03-15 | House | Bill scheduled for decision making on Tuesday, 03-19-13 11:40AM in conference room 309. |
2013-03-15 | House | The committee(s) on LAB/EEP recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until 03-19-13. |
2013-03-12 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by LAB/EEP on Friday, 03-15-13 10:30AM in House conference room 309. |
2013-03-07 | House | Referred to LAB/EEP, CPC, referral sheet 30 |
2013-03-07 | House | Pass First Reading |
2013-03-05 | House | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 157) in amended form (SD 1). |
2013-03-05 | Senate | Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 1). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House. |
2013-02-28 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice 03-05-13. |
2013-02-28 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1). |
2013-02-28 | Senate | Reported from CPN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 538) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and placement on the calendar for Third Reading. |
2013-02-26 | Senate | The committee(s) on CPN recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in CPN were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Baker, Galuteria, Taniguchi, Wakai; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Solomon ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Nishihara, Slom. |
2013-02-13 | Senate | The committee(s) on CPN deferred the measure until 02-26-13 10:00AM in conference room 229. |
2013-01-31 | Senate | The committee(s) on CPN has scheduled a public hearing on 02-13-13 8:30AM in conference room 229. |
2013-01-22 | Senate | Referred to CPN. |
2013-01-22 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2013-01-18 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
HB1129 (Same As) 2013-01-28 - Referred to LAB, CPC, referral sheet 6