HI SB519 | 2019 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future SB519
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 5 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-07 - Referred to LHE/AGR, FIN, referral sheet 27
Pending: House Lower and Higher Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 5 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-07 - Referred to LHE/AGR, FIN, referral sheet 27
Pending: House Lower and Higher Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires the University of Hawaii College of Tropical Agriculture and Human Resources to partner with the Hawaii agriculture community to establish a food safety certification training program to provide assistance to small- and medium-sized farms in obtaining a United States Department of Agriculture Good Agricultural Practices certification or an equivalent certification. Appropriates funds. Effective 7/1/2050. (SD2)
Title
Relating To Food Safety.
Sponsors
Sen. Mike Gabbard [D] | Sen. Breene Harimoto [D] | Sen. Gil Keith-agaran [D] | Sen. Clarence Nishihara [D] |
Sen. Gil Riviere [D] | Sen. Russell Ruderman [D] | Sen. Kalani English [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-07 | House | Referred to LHE/AGR, FIN, referral sheet 27 |
2019-03-07 | House | Pass First Reading |
2019-03-05 | House | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 167) in amended form (SD 2). |
2019-03-05 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). Ayes, 24; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 1 (Senator(s) Harimoto). Transmitted to House. |
2019-03-01 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice 03-05-19. |
2019-03-01 | Senate | Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1182) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). |
2019-02-12 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 11 Aye(s): Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Keith-Agaran, English, Harimoto, Inouye, Kanuha, Kidani, Moriwaki, Riviere, Taniguchi, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) K. Kahele, Shimabukuro. |
2019-02-08 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 02-12-19 10:00AM in conference room 211. |
2019-02-05 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM. |
2019-02-05 | Senate | Reported from AEN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 35) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM. |
2019-01-30 | Senate | The committee(s) on AEN recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in AEN were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Gabbard, Ruderman, K. Rhoads, L. Thielen, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2019-01-25 | Senate | The committee(s) on AEN has scheduled a public hearing on 01-30-19 1:15PM in conference room 224. |
2019-01-24 | Senate | Referred to AEN, WAM. |
2019-01-22 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2019-01-18 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
SB519 (Carry Over) 2019-03-07 - Referred to LHE/AGR, FIN, referral sheet 27
Subjects
Appropriation ($)
Certification Training Program
Food Safety
University of Hawaii College of Tropical Agriculture and Human Resources
Certification Training Program
Food Safety
University of Hawaii College of Tropical Agriculture and Human Resources