HI SB524 | 2019 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future SB524
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 18 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-01-28 - Re-Referred to PSM, CPH/WAM.
Pending: Senate Public Safety, Intergovernmental and Military Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 18 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-01-28 - Re-Referred to PSM, CPH/WAM.
Pending: Senate Public Safety, Intergovernmental and Military Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Removes provisions of law preempting counties and communities from regulating the sale of tobacco products through local laws and ordinances.
Title
Relating To County Authority On The Sale Of Tobacco Products.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-28 | Senate | Re-Referred to PSM, CPH/WAM. |
2019-01-24 | Senate | Referred to PSM, CPH. |
2019-01-22 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2019-01-18 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
SB524 (Carry Over) 2019-01-28 - Re-Referred to PSM, CPH/WAM.
Subjects
Cigarettes
Counties
Electronic Smoking Devices
Local Communities
Ordinances
Restriction
Sale
State Law Preemption
Tobacco Products
Counties
Electronic Smoking Devices
Local Communities
Ordinances
Restriction
Sale
State Law Preemption
Tobacco Products
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=SB&billnumber=524&year=2019 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2019/bills/SB524_.HTM |