HI SB527 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-1)
Status: Introduced on January 18 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-02-14 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Requires the Department of Health to convene a working group to develop a universal symbol, quality control procedures with a focus on a retail product recall system, and standards, regulations, and protocols for the manufacture and sale of edible medical cannabis products. Requires report to the legislature. (SD1)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating To Cannabis For Medical Use.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-02-14SenateReport adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.
2019-02-14SenateReported from CPH (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 379) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM.
2019-02-06SenateThe committee(s) on CPH recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in CPH were as follows: 6 Aye(s): Senator(s) Baker, S. Chang, J.Keohokalole, Ruderman, L. Thielen, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Nishihara.
2019-02-01SenateThe committee(s) on CPH has scheduled a public hearing on 02-06-19 9:30AM in conference room 229.
2019-02-01SenateRe-Referred to CPH, WAM.
2019-01-24SenateReferred to CPH, JDC/WAM.
2019-01-22SenatePassed First Reading.
2019-01-18SenateIntroduced.

Same As/Similar To

HB583 (Same As) 2019-01-22 - Referred to HLT, JUD/CPC, FIN, referral sheet 4

Subjects


Hawaii State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback