HI SB528 | 2019 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future SB528
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-1)
Status: Introduced on January 18 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-15 - The committee on CPH deferred the measure.
Pending: Senate Commerce, Consumer Protection, and Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 18 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-15 - The committee on CPH deferred the measure.
Pending: Senate Commerce, Consumer Protection, and Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Expands the pool of orthodontists who are eligible to perform medically necessary orthodontic services for treatment of certain orofacial anomalies covered by health insurance.
Title
Relating To Health Care Practitioners.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-15 | Senate | The committee on CPH deferred the measure. |
2019-02-11 | Senate | The committee(s) on CPH has scheduled a public hearing on 02-15-19 9:30AM in conference room 229. |
2019-01-24 | Senate | Referred to CPH. |
2019-01-22 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2019-01-18 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
SB528 (Carry Over) 2019-02-15 - The committee on CPH deferred the measure.
HB677 (Same As) 2019-01-24 - Referred to HLT, CPC, FIN, referral sheet 5
HB677 (Same As) 2019-01-24 - Referred to HLT, CPC, FIN, referral sheet 5
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=SB&billnumber=528&year=2019 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2019/bills/SB528_.HTM |