HI SB529 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Passed on July 9 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-07-09 - Act 253, 7/1/2013 (Gov. Msg. No. 1356).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Passed on July 9 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-07-09 - Act 253, 7/1/2013 (Gov. Msg. No. 1356).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Prohibits family courts from awarding custody of or visitation with a child to a natural parent who has been convicted of rape or sexual assault that resulted in the child's conception. Authorizes the family courts to terminate parental rights of the convicted natural parent. (SB529 HD1)
Title
Parental Rights; Rape; Sexual Assault
Sponsors
Sen. Suzanne Chun Oakland [D] | Sen. Rosalyn Baker [D] | Sen. Maile Shimabukuro [D] | Sen. Malama Solomon [D] |
Sen. Michelle Kidani [D] | Sen. Donna Kim [D] | Sen. Laura Thielen [D] | Sen. Jill Tokuda [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-07-09 | Senate | Act 253, 7/1/2013 (Gov. Msg. No. 1356). |
2013-07-09 | House | Act 253, on 7/1/2013 (Gov. Msg. No. 1356). |
2013-04-17 | Senate | Enrolled to Governor. |
2013-04-17 | House | Received notice of reconsideration, Senate agreement, and Final Reading (Sen. Com. No. 700). |
2013-04-17 | Senate | Passed Final Reading. 24 Aye(s); Aye(s) with reservations: none . 0 No(es): none. 1 Excused: Ihara. |
2013-04-16 | Senate | One Day Notice 04-17-13. |
2013-04-16 | Senate | Senate agrees with House amendments. Placed on the calendar for Final Reading on 04-17-13. |
2013-04-16 | Senate | Reconsideration of action taken on 04-11-13 in disagreeing to the House amendments. |
2013-04-16 | Senate | Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 699). |
2013-04-15 | House | House conferees appointed: Carroll, Belatti Co-Chairs; Kobayashi, Fukumoto. |
2013-04-11 | House | Received notice of disagreement (Sen. Com. No. 607). |
2013-04-11 | Senate | Senate disagrees with House amendments. |
2013-04-11 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 531). |
2013-04-09 | House | Passed Third Reading as amended in HD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0). Transmitted to Senate. |
2013-04-05 | House | Forty-eight (48) hours notice, Tuesday 04-09-13. |
2013-04-05 | House | Reported from JUD (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1488) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Third Reading. |
2013-03-28 | House | The committees on JUD recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Rhoads, Har, Brower, Tsuji, Wooley, McDermott, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 6 Excused: Representative(s) Belatti, Cabanilla, Carroll, Ito, Kawakami, C. Lee. |
2013-03-21 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by JUD on Thursday, 03-28-13 2:00PM in House conference room 325. |
2013-03-21 | House | This measure has been deleted from the meeting scheduled on Friday 03-22-13 2:00PM in conference room 325. |
2013-03-19 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by JUD on Friday, 03-22-13 2:00PM in House conference room 325. |
2013-03-19 | House | Passed Second Reading and referred to the committee(s) on JUD with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0). |
2013-03-19 | House | Reported from HUS (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1015), recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to JUD. |
2013-03-12 | House | The committees on HUS recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 6 Ayes: Representative(s) Carroll, Kobayashi, Belatti, Morikawa, Woodson, Fukumoto; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Cabanilla, Jordan. |
2013-03-11 | House | Broadcast of hearing/briefing available. See: www.capitoltv.org |
2013-03-08 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by HUS on Tuesday, 03-12-13 9:30AM in House conference room 329. |
2013-03-07 | House | Referred to HUS, JUD, referral sheet 30 |
2013-03-07 | House | Pass First Reading |
2013-03-05 | House | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 162) in amended form (SD 1). |
2013-03-05 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 1). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House. |
2013-02-28 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice 03-05-13. |
2013-02-28 | Senate | Reported from JDL (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 581) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 1). |
2013-02-25 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDL recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in JDL were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Hee, Shimabukuro, Gabbard, Ihara, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2013-02-22 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDL has scheduled a public hearing on 02-25-13 10:00AM in conference room 016. |
2013-02-20 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDL has scheduled a public hearing on 02-22-13 11:30AM in conference room 016. |
2013-02-04 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to JDL. |
2013-02-04 | Senate | Reported from HMS (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 30) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading and referral to JDL. |
2013-01-29 | Senate | The committee(s) on HMS recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in HMS were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Chun Oakland, Green, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Kidani, Taniguchi. |
2013-01-24 | Senate | The committee(s) on HMS added the measure to the public hearing scheduled on 01-29-13 1:30PM in conference room 016. |
2013-01-22 | Senate | Referred to HMS, JDL. |
2013-01-22 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2013-01-18 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
HB405 (Same As) 2013-01-22 - Referred to HUS, JUD, referral sheet 3