HI SB530 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-1)
Status: Engrossed on March 5 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-04-26 - The conference committee deferred the measure.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Exempts from the general excise tax gross receipts from the sale of mobility enhancing equipment, hearing aids, prosthetic devices, durable medical equipment, and prescription drugs sold pursuant to a doctor's prescription. Amends the definition of "prosthetic device" to include a replacement, corrective, or supportive device worn on or in the body. (SB530 HD1)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating To The General Excise Tax.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-26SenateThe conference committee deferred the measure.
2019-04-25SenateConference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-26-19 9:30AM in conference room 229.
2019-04-24SenateConference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-25-19 9:30AM in conference room 229.
2019-04-23SenateConference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-24-19 9:30AM in conference room 229.
2019-04-22SenateConference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-23-19 9:30AM in conference room 229.
2019-04-18SenateConference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-22-19 10:30AM in conference room 229.
2019-04-17SenateConference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-18-19 10:30AM in conference room 229.
2019-04-16SenateConference committee meeting scheduled for 04-17-19 10:30AM in conference room 229.
2019-04-15HouseReceived notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 901).
2019-04-15SenateSenate Conferees Appointed: Baker Chair; English Co-Chair; S. Chang, Fevella.
2019-04-15SenateReceived notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 809).
2019-04-15HouseHouse Conferees Appointed: Mizuno, B. Kobayashi Co-Chairs; D. Kobayashi, Ward.
2019-04-09HouseReceived notice of disagreement (Sen. Com. No. 885).
2019-04-09SenateSenate disagrees with House amendments.
2019-04-09SenateReceived from House (Hse. Com. No. 663).
2019-04-05HousePassed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Eli, Mizuno, Nishimoto excused (3). Transmitted to Senate.
2019-04-04HouseDeferred one day 04-05-19.
2019-04-04HouseReported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2071), recommending passage on Third Reading.
2019-04-01HouseThe committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 12 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Cullen, Eli, Gates, Hashimoto, Kitagawa, B. Kobayashi, Matayoshi, Nakamura, Nishimoto, Wildberger, Yamashita; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 3 Excused: Representative(s) Holt, Todd, McDermott.
2019-03-29HouseBill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Monday, 04-01-19 2:00PM in House conference room 308.
2019-03-19HousePassed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Belatti, Quinlan, Yamane excused (3).
2019-03-19HouseReported from HLT (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1408) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN.
2019-03-14HouseThe committees on HLT recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Mizuno, B. Kobayashi, Belatti, Nakamura, San Buenaventura, Say, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Tokioka.
2019-03-11HouseBill scheduled to be heard by HLT on Thursday, 03-14-19 9:00AM in House conference room 329.
2019-03-07HouseReferred to HLT, FIN, referral sheet 27
2019-03-07HousePass First Reading
2019-03-05HouseReceived from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 173) in amended form (SD 2).
2019-03-05SenateReport adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). Ayes, 24; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 1 (Senator(s) Harimoto). Transmitted to House.
2019-03-01Senate48 Hrs. Notice 03-05-19.
2019-03-01SenateReported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1067) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 2).
2019-02-13SenateThe committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 9 Aye(s): Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Keith-Agaran, Harimoto, Inouye, Kanuha, Moriwaki, Shimabukuro, Taniguchi, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 4 Excused: Senator(s) English, K. Kahele, Kidani, Riviere.
2019-02-08SenateThe committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 02-13-19 10:00AM in conference room 211.
2019-02-07SenateReport adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.
2019-02-07SenateReported from CPH (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 94) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM.
2019-01-30SenateThe committee(s) on CPH recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in CPH were as follows: 7 Aye(s): Senator(s) Baker, S. Chang, J.Keohokalole, Nishihara, Ruderman, L. Thielen, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none.
2019-01-25SenateThe committee(s) on CPH has scheduled a public hearing on 01-30-19 9:00AM in conference room 229.
2019-01-24SenateReferred to CPH, WAM.
2019-01-22SenatePassed First Reading.
2019-01-18SenateIntroduced.

Same As/Similar To

HB345 (Same As) 2019-02-13 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Holt, McDermott, Nakamura, Ward excused (4).

Subjects


Hawaii State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback