HI SB533 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-1)
Status: Engrossed on March 5 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-03-07 - Referred to LAB/JUD, FIN, referral sheet 27
Pending: House Labor & Public Employment Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Clarifies that any member of a state board or commission whose nomination for appointment or reappointment is withdrawn for cause by the governor prior to the senate's advice and consent action shall be considered disqualified, and in the case of the nomination for reappointment, the member shall be ineligible to continue to serve as a holdover member beyond the member's most recent term of appointment. Effective 7/1/2050. (SD2)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating To State Boards And Commissions.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-07HouseReferred to LAB/JUD, FIN, referral sheet 27
2019-03-07HousePass First Reading
2019-03-05HouseReceived from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 174) in amended form (SD 2).
2019-03-05SenateReport adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). Ayes, 24; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 1 (Senator(s) Harimoto). Transmitted to House.
2019-03-01Senate48 Hrs. Notice 03-05-19.
2019-03-01SenateReported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1107) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 2).
2019-02-14SenateThe committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 12 Aye(s): Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Keith-Agaran, English, Harimoto, Inouye, Kanuha, Kidani, Moriwaki, Riviere, Shimabukuro, Taniguchi, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) K. Kahele.
2019-02-11SenateThe committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 02-14-19 10:00AM in conference room 211.
2019-02-08SenateReport adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.
2019-02-08SenateReported from GVO (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 122) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM.
2019-01-31SenateThe committee(s) on GVO recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in GVO were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) L. Thielen, Inouye, Kanuha, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Baker.
2019-01-28SenateThe committee(s) on GVO has scheduled a public hearing on 01-31-19 2:45PM in conference room 225.
2019-01-24SenateReferred to GVO, WAM.
2019-01-22SenatePassed First Reading.
2019-01-18SenateIntroduced.

Subjects


Hawaii State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback