HI SB535 | 2013 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on July 9 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-07-09 - Act 248, 7/1/2013 (Gov. Msg. No. 1351).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Establishes basic rights and protections for domestic workers. (CD1)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Domestic Workers Bill of Rights

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2013-07-09SenateAct 248, 7/1/2013 (Gov. Msg. No. 1351).
2013-07-09HouseAct 248, on 7/1/2013 (Gov. Msg. No. 1351).
2013-05-07SenateEnrolled to Governor.
2013-05-02SenateReceived notice of passage on Final Reading in House (Hse. Com. No. 761).
2013-05-01HouseReceived notice of Final Reading (Sen. Com. No. 755).
2013-04-30HousePassed Final Reading as amended in CD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Fale, Fukumoto, Har, Ito, Jordan, McDermott voting no (6) and none excused (0).
2013-04-30SenatePassed Final Reading, as amended (CD 1). 24 Aye(s); Aye(s) with reservations: none . 1 No(es): Senator(s) Slom. 0 Excused: none.
2013-04-25Senate48 Hrs. Notice (as amended CD 1) 04-30-13.
2013-04-25SenateReported from Conference Committee as amended CD 1 (Conf. Com. Rep. No. 76).
2013-04-25HouseForty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 4-30-13
2013-04-25HouseReported from Conference Committee (Conf Com. Rep. No. 76) as amended in (CD 1).
2013-04-25HouseThe Conference Committee recommends that the measure be Passed, with Amendments. The votes were as follows: 5 Ayes: Representative(s) Nakashima, Tsuji, Rhoads, Hashem; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Johanson; 0 Noes: none; and 0 Excused: none.
2013-04-25SenateThe Conference committee recommends that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes of the Senate Conference Managers were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Hee, Shimabukuro, Gabbard; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none.
2013-04-24SenateConference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-25-13 10:30AM in conference room 325.
2013-04-23SenateConference committee meeting scheduled for 04-24-13 10:30AM in conference room 325.
2013-04-19SenateReceived notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 704).
2013-04-18HouseHouse conferees appointed: Nakashima, Tsuji, Rhoads Co-Chairs; Hashem, Johanson.
2013-04-15HouseReceived notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 692).
2013-04-15SenateSenate Conferees appointed: Hee, Chair; Shimabukuro, Co-Chair(s); Gabbard.
2013-04-11HouseReceived notice of disagreement (Sen. Com. No. 607).
2013-04-11SenateSenate disagrees with House amendments.
2013-04-11SenateReceived from House (Hse. Com. No. 533).
2013-04-09HousePassed Third Reading as amended in HD 2 with Representative(s) Ward voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Fale, Fukumoto, McDermott voting no (3) and none excused (0). Transmitted to Senate.
2013-04-05HouseForty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 04-09-13.
2013-04-05HouseReported from JUD (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1616) as amended in HD 2, recommending passage on Third Reading.
2013-04-04HouseThe committees on JUD recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 10 Ayes: Representative(s) Rhoads, Har, Belatti, Brower, Carroll, Kawakami, C. Lee, Wooley; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Ito, Tsuji; 2 Noes: Representative(s) McDermott, Thielen; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Cabanilla.
2013-04-01HouseBill scheduled to be heard by JUD on Thursday, 04-04-13 2:00PM in House conference room 325.
2013-03-22HousePassed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on JUD with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and McKelvey, Takumi, Woodson excused (3).
2013-03-22HouseReported from LAB/EDB (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1166) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to JUD.
2013-03-19HouseThe committees on EDB recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 8 Ayes: Representative(s) Tsuji, Brower, Choy, Ohno, Onishi, Takayama, Tokioka; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Ward; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Cachola.
2013-03-19HouseThe committees on LAB recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Nakashima, Hashem, Aquino, Ing, Takumi, Yamane, Yamashita; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Ichiyama, Johanson.
2013-03-15HouseBill scheduled for decision making on Tuesday, 03-19-13 11:25AM in conference room 309.
2013-03-15HouseThe committee(s) on LAB/EDB recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until 03-19-13.
2013-03-12HouseBill scheduled to be heard by LAB/EDB on Friday, 03-15-13 11:00AM in House conference room 309.
2013-03-07HouseReferred to LAB/EDB, JUD, referral sheet 30
2013-03-07HousePass First Reading
2013-03-05HouseReceived from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 164) in amended form (SD 1).
2013-03-05SenatePassed Third Reading, as amended (SD 1). Ayes, 24; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 1 (Senator(s) Slom). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House.
2013-02-28Senate48 Hrs. Notice 03-05-13.
2013-02-28SenateReport adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1).
2013-02-28SenateReported from JDL (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 493) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and placement on the calendar for Third Reading.
2013-02-07SenateThe committee(s) on JDL recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in JDL were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Hee, Shimabukuro, Gabbard; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Ihara ; 1 No(es): Senator(s) Slom; and 0 Excused: none.
2013-02-04SenateThe committee(s) on JDL has scheduled a public hearing on 02-07-13 10:00AM in conference room 016.
2013-01-22SenateReferred to JDL.
2013-01-22SenatePassed First Reading.
2013-01-18SenateIntroduced.

Same As/Similar To

HB56 (Same As) 2013-01-18 - Referred to LAB, FIN, referral sheet 1
HB413 (Same As) 2013-01-22 - Referred to LAB, JUD, referral sheet 3

Hawaii State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback