HI SB535 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-1)
Status: Enrolled on May 1 2019 - 75% progression
Action: 2019-05-06 - Enrolled to Governor.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Authorizes pharmacists, acting in good faith and exercising reasonable care, to prescribe and dispense an opioid antagonist to patients at risk of overdose, and family members and caregivers of patients at risk of overdose. Sunsets 6/30/2024. (CD1)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating To Pharmacists Prescribing And Dispensing Of Opioid Antagonist.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-06SenateEnrolled to Governor.
2019-05-02SenateReceived notice of passage on Final Reading in House (Hse. Com. No. 883).
2019-05-01HouseReceived notice of Final Reading (Sen. Com. No. 968).
2019-04-30HousePassed Final Reading as amended in CD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Cachola voting no (1) and none excused (0).
2019-04-30SenatePassed Final Reading, as amended (CD 1). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . 0 No(es): none. 0 Excused: none.
2019-04-25HouseForty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 04-30-19.
2019-04-25HouseReported from Conference Committee (Conf Com. Rep. No. 28) as amended in (CD 1).
2019-04-25Senate48 Hrs. Notice (as amended CD 1) 04-30-19.
2019-04-25SenateReported from Conference Committee as amended CD 1 (Conf. Com. Rep. No. 28).
2019-04-23HouseThe Conference Committee recommends that the measure be Passed, with Amendments. The votes were as follows: 4 Ayes: Representative(s) Mizuno, Ohno, C. Lee, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 0 Excused: none.
2019-04-23SenateThe Conference committee recommends that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes of the Senate Conference Managers were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Baker, S. Chang, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none.
2019-04-22SenateConference committee meeting scheduled for 04-23-19 3:00PM in conference room 229.
2019-04-17HouseReceived notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 907).
2019-04-17SenateSenate Conferees Appointed: Baker Chair; S. Chang, Fevella.
2019-04-15SenateReceived notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 809).
2019-04-15HouseHouse Conferees Appointed: Mizuno, Ohno, C. Lee Co-Chairs; Ward.
2019-04-05HouseReceived notice of disagreement (Sen. Com. No. 685).
2019-04-05SenateSenate disagrees with House amendments.
2019-04-04SenateDeferred One Day 04-05-19.
2019-04-03SenateDeferred One Day 04-04-19.
2019-04-03SenateReceived from House (Hse. Com. No. 530).
2019-04-02HousePassed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Saiki, Todd, Yamane excused (3). Transmitted to Senate.
2019-04-02HouseReported from JUD (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1928), recommending passage on Third Reading.
2019-03-27HouseThe committees on JUD recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 9 Ayes: Representative(s) C. Lee, San Buenaventura, Brower, Lowen, Morikawa, Say, Takayama, Yamane, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Creagan, McKelvey.
2019-03-25HouseBill scheduled for decision making on Wednesday, 03-27-19 2:00PM in conference room 325.
2019-03-25HouseThe committee(s) on JUD recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until 03-27-19 2:00PM.
2019-03-22HouseBill scheduled to be heard by JUD on Monday, 03-25-19 2:00PM in House conference room 325.
2019-03-20HousePassed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on JUD with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Belatti, Yamane excused (2).
2019-03-20HouseReported from HLT/IAC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1479) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to JUD.
2019-03-12HouseThe committees on IAC recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 5 Ayes: Representative(s) Ohno, D. Kobayashi, Kong, Takayama, McDermott; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Gates, Nishimoto.
2019-03-12HouseThe committees on HLT recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Mizuno, B. Kobayashi, Belatti, Nakamura, San Buenaventura, Tokioka, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Say.
2019-03-08HouseBill scheduled to be heard by HLT/IAC on Tuesday, 03-12-19 8:30AM in House conference room 329.
2019-03-07HouseReferred to HLT/IAC, JUD, referral sheet 27
2019-03-07HousePass First Reading
2019-03-05HouseReceived from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 175) in amended form (SD 1).
2019-03-05SenatePassed Third Reading, as amended (SD 1). Ayes, 24; Aye(s) with reservations: none. Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 1 (Senator(s) Harimoto). Transmitted to House.
2019-03-01Senate48 Hrs. Notice 03-05-19.
2019-03-01SenateReport adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1).
2019-03-01SenateReported from CPH (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 843) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and placement on the calendar for Third Reading.
2019-02-22SenateThe committee(s) on CPH recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in CPH were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Baker, J.Keohokalole, Nishihara, L. Thielen; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 3 Excused: Senator(s) S. Chang, Ruderman, Fevella.
2019-02-21SenateThe committee(s) on CPH deferred the measure until 02-22-19 9:30AM in conference room 229.
2019-02-15SenateThe committee(s) on CPH has scheduled a public hearing on 02-21-19 9:00AM in conference room 229.
2019-01-24SenateReferred to CPH.
2019-01-22SenatePassed First Reading.
2019-01-18SenateIntroduced.

Same As/Similar To

HB700 (Same As) 2019-03-07 - Referred to CPH.

Subjects


Hawaii State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback