HI SB538 | 2019 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future SB538
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-1)
Status: Introduced on January 18 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-07 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to JDC.
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 18 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-07 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to JDC.
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes mental health professionals who are enrolled in an accredited training program or have completed all licensing requirements except for experience hours or the licensing examination, or both, and are under the supervision of a licensed mental health professional, to provide minor-initiated mental health treatment or counseling services without the consent of the minor's parent or legal guardian. (SD1)
Title
Relating To Mental Health.
Sponsors
Sen. Rosalyn Baker [D] | Sen. Kalani English [D] | Sen. Karl Rhoads [D] | Sen. Russell Ruderman [D] |
Sen. Kurt Fevella [R] | Sen. Kaiali'i Kahele [D] | Sen. Clarence Nishihara [D] | Sen. Maile Shimabukuro [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-07 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to JDC. |
2019-02-07 | Senate | Reported from CPH (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 100) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to JDC. |
2019-01-31 | Senate | The committee(s) on CPH recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in CPH were as follows: 7 Aye(s): Senator(s) Baker, S. Chang, J.Keohokalole, Nishihara, Ruderman, L. Thielen, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2019-01-25 | Senate | The committee(s) on CPH has scheduled a public hearing on 01-31-19 9:30AM in conference room 229. |
2019-01-24 | Senate | Referred to CPH, JDC. |
2019-01-22 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2019-01-18 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
SB538 (Carry Over) 2019-02-07 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to JDC.
HB580 (Same As) 2019-02-01 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on CPC with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Say, Thielen, Todd, Tokioka excused (4).
HB580 (Same As) 2019-02-01 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on CPC with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Say, Thielen, Todd, Tokioka excused (4).