HI SB542 | 2019 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future SB542
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Introduced on January 18 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-01-28 - Re-Referred to CPH, JDC.
Pending: Senate Commerce, Consumer Protection, and Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 18 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-01-28 - Re-Referred to CPH, JDC.
Pending: Senate Commerce, Consumer Protection, and Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requires reimbursement for prescriptions issued pursuant to the our care, our choice act, regardless of the prescription drug coverage provisions of the patient's health insurance. Establishes penalties for pharmacies and pharmacists, or their agents, that refuse to honor prescriptions issued under the our care, our choice act.
Title
Relating To Health.
Sponsors
Sen. Rosalyn Baker [D] | Sen. Stanley Chang [D] | Sen. Michelle Kidani [D] | Sen. Kaiali'i Kahele [D] |
Sen. Clarence Nishihara [D] | Sen. Russell Ruderman [D] | Sen. Maile Shimabukuro [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-28 | Senate | Re-Referred to CPH, JDC. |
2019-01-24 | Senate | Referred to CPH, WAM. |
2019-01-22 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2019-01-18 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
SB542 (Carry Over) 2019-01-28 - Re-Referred to CPH, JDC.
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=SB&billnumber=542&year=2019 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2019/bills/SB542_.HTM |