HI SB543 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Engrossed on March 1 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-03-07 - Referred to TRN, CPC, referral sheet 27
Pending: House Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Clarifies that the requirement for a motor vehicle insurer to maintain a complete sales and claims service office does not apply to the county of Kalawao.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating To Motor Vehicle Insurance.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-07HouseReferred to TRN, CPC, referral sheet 27
2019-03-05HousePass First Reading
2019-03-01HouseReceived from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 19).
2019-03-01SenatePassed Third Reading. Ayes, 24; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 1 (Senator(s) Harimoto). Transmitted to House.
2019-02-28SenateOne Day Notice 03-01-19.
2019-02-28SenateReport adopted; Passed Second Reading.
2019-02-28SenateReported from CPH (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 760) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading and placement on the calendar for Third Reading.
2019-02-15SenateThe committee(s) on CPH recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in CPH were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Baker, J.Keohokalole, Ruderman, L. Thielen, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) S. Chang, Nishihara.
2019-02-11SenateThe committee(s) on CPH has scheduled a public hearing on 02-15-19 9:30AM in conference room 229.
2019-01-24SenateReferred to CPH.
2019-01-22SenatePassed First Reading.
2019-01-18SenateIntroduced.

Same As/Similar To

HB764 (Same As) 2019-04-24 - Act 019, 04/23/2019 (Gov. Msg. No. 1120).

Subjects


Hawaii State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback