HI SB548 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on June 26 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-06-26 - Act 189, 6/25/2013 (Gov. Msg. No. 1292).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on June 26 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-06-26 - Act 189, 6/25/2013 (Gov. Msg. No. 1292).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Exempts from licensing requirements in the State any commissioned medical officer or psychologist employed by the U.S. Department of Defense, who is credentialed by Tripler Army Medical Center, while providing direct telemedicine support or services to neighbor island beneficiaries within a Hawaii national guard armory on the island of Kauai, Hawaii, Molokai, or Maui. (CD1)
Title
Telemedicine; Behavioral Health; License Exemption; Military Patients
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-06-26 | Senate | Act 189, 6/25/2013 (Gov. Msg. No. 1292). |
2013-06-26 | House | Act 189, on 6/25/2013 (Gov. Msg. No. 1292). |
2013-05-07 | Senate | Enrolled to Governor. |
2013-05-02 | Senate | Received notice of passage on Final Reading in House (Hse. Com. No. 761). |
2013-05-01 | House | Received notice of Final Reading (Sen. Com. No. 755). |
2013-04-30 | House | Passed Final Reading as amended in CD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0). |
2013-04-30 | Senate | Passed Final Reading, as amended (CD 1). 25 Aye(s); Aye(s) with reservations: none . 0 No(es): none. 0 Excused: none. |
2013-04-25 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice (as amended CD 1) 04-30-13. |
2013-04-25 | Senate | Reported from Conference Committee as amended CD 1 (Conf. Com. Rep. No. 79). |
2013-04-25 | House | Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 4-30-13 |
2013-04-25 | House | Reported from Conference Committee (Conf Com. Rep. No. 79) as amended in (CD 1). |
2013-04-25 | House | The Conference Committee recommends that the measure be Passed, with Amendments. The votes were as follows: 4 Ayes: Representative(s) Takai, Belatti, McKelvey, Ito; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Ward. |
2013-04-25 | Senate | The Conference committee recommends that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes of the Senate Conference Managers were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Espero, Green, Wakai, Baker; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Slom. |
2013-04-24 | Senate | Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-25-13 9:30AM in conference room 312. |
2013-04-23 | Senate | Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-24-13 9:30AM in conference room 312. |
2013-04-22 | Senate | Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-23-13 9:30AM in conference room 312. |
2013-04-17 | Senate | Conference committee meeting scheduled for 04-22-13 9:30AM in conference room 312. |
2013-04-16 | Senate | Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 699). |
2013-04-15 | House | House conferees appointed: Takai, Belatti, McKelvey Co-Chairs; Ito, Ward. |
2013-04-15 | House | Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 692). |
2013-04-15 | Senate | Senate Conferees appointed: Espero, Chair; Green, Wakai, Baker, Co-Chair(s); Slom. |
2013-04-11 | House | Received notice of disagreement (Sen. Com. No. 607). |
2013-04-11 | Senate | Senate disagrees with House amendments. |
2013-04-11 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 534). |
2013-04-09 | House | Passed Third Reading as amended in HD 2 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0). Transmitted to Senate. |
2013-04-05 | House | Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 04-09-13. |
2013-04-05 | House | Reported from CPC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1561) as amended in HD 2, recommending passage on Third Reading. |
2013-04-01 | House | The committees on CPC recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 9 Ayes: Representative(s) Kawakami, Belatti, Brower, Cachola, Evans, C. Lee, Tsuji, Yamane, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 6 Excused: Representative(s) McKelvey, Cabanilla, Carroll, Har, Ito, McDermott. |
2013-03-27 | House | Bill scheduled for decision making on Monday, 04-01-13 2:25PM in conference room 325. |
2013-03-27 | House | The committee(s) on CPC recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until 04-01-13. |
2013-03-22 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by CPC on Wednesday, 03-27-13 4:00PM in House conference room 325. |
2013-03-22 | House | Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on CPC with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Hanohano, McKelvey, Takumi, Woodson excused (4). |
2013-03-22 | House | Reported from HLT (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1216), recommending referral to CPC. |
2013-03-20 | House | The committees on HLT recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 5 Ayes: Representative(s) Belatti, Morikawa, Kobayashi, Woodson, Cheape; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 3 Excused: Representative(s) Cabanilla, Carroll, Jordan. |
2013-03-15 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by HLT on Wednesday, 03-20-13 8:30AM in House conference room 329. |
2013-03-14 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on HLT with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) McKelvey, Mizuno excused (2). |
2013-03-14 | House | Reported from VMI (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 943) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to HLT. |
2013-03-13 | House | The committees on VMI recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 8 Ayes: Representative(s) Takai, Ito, Brower, Ohno, Onishi, Takayama, Tsuji; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Cachola; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Choy, McDermott. |
2013-03-11 | House | Broadcast of hearing/briefing available. See: www.capitoltv.org |
2013-03-08 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by VMI on Wednesday, 03-13-13 8:30AM in House conference room 312. |
2013-03-08 | House | Re-referred to VMI, HLT, CPC, referral sheet 32 |
2013-03-07 | House | Referred to VMI/HLT, CPC, referral sheet 30 |
2013-03-07 | House | Pass First Reading |
2013-03-05 | House | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 167) in amended form (SD 1). |
2013-03-05 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 1). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House. |
2013-02-28 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice 03-05-13. |
2013-02-28 | Senate | Reported from CPN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 582) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 1). |
2013-02-20 | Senate | The committee(s) on CPN recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in CPN were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Baker, Galuteria, Solomon, Wakai, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Nishihara, Taniguchi. |
2013-02-15 | Senate | The committee(s) on CPN will hold a public decision making on 02-20-13 9:30AM in conference room 229. |
2013-02-14 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to CPN. |
2013-02-14 | Senate | Reported from PSM/HTH/TEC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 294) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading and referral to CPN. |
2013-02-07 | Senate | The committee(s) on TEC recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in TEC were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Wakai, Nishihara, Tokuda; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Gabbard, Slom. |
2013-02-01 | Senate | The committee(s) on HTH recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in HTH were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Green, Baker, Nishihara; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Chun Oakland, Slom. |
2013-01-31 | Senate | The committee(s) on TEC will hold a public decision making on 02-07-13 1:15PM in conference room 414. |
2013-01-31 | Senate | The committee(s) on HTH deferred the measure until 02-01-13 1:15PM in conference room 229. |
2013-01-31 | Senate | The committee(s) on PSM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in PSM were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Espero, Baker, Galuteria, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Green. |
2013-01-28 | Senate | The committee(s) on PSM/HTH/TEC has scheduled a public hearing on 01-31-13 2:45PM in conference room 224. |
2013-01-22 | Senate | Referred to PSM/HTH/TEC, CPN. |
2013-01-22 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2013-01-18 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
HB162 (Same As) 2013-01-22 - Referred to VMI/HLT, CPC, , referral sheet 2