HI SB551 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on July 12 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-12 - Became law without the Governor's signature, Act 282, 07/10/2019, (Gov. Msg. No. 1402).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on July 12 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-12 - Became law without the Governor's signature, Act 282, 07/10/2019, (Gov. Msg. No. 1402).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires associations to offer mediation with a notice of default and intention to foreclose. Clarifies that the explicit grant of power of sale to associations is not required for the purposes of enforcing association liens under the association alternate power of sale foreclosure process. Applies retroactively to pending matters that arose prior to the effective date. (CD1)
Title
Relating To Condominiums.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-07-12 | Senate | Became law without the Governor's signature, Act 282, 07/10/2019, (Gov. Msg. No. 1402). |
2019-07-12 | House | Became law without the Governor's signature, Act 282, 07/10/2019, (Gov. Msg. No. 1402). |
2019-06-24 | Senate | Notice of Intent to veto dated 06-24-19 (Gov. Msg. No. 1202) |
2019-06-24 | House | Notice of intent to veto (Gov. Msg. No. 1202) |
2019-05-06 | Senate | Enrolled to Governor. |
2019-05-02 | Senate | Received notice of passage on Final Reading in House (Hse. Com. No. 883). |
2019-05-01 | House | Received notice of Final Reading (Sen. Com. No. 968). |
2019-04-30 | House | Passed Final Reading as amended in CD 1 with Representative(s) B. Kobayashi, Lowen voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) DeCoite, Eli, Gates, Har, Holt, Matayoshi, McKelvey, Perruso, Quinlan, San Buenaventura, Say, Tokioka, Wildberger voting no (13) and none excused (0). |
2019-04-30 | Senate | Passed Final Reading, as amended (CD 1). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . 0 No(es): none. 0 Excused: none. |
2019-04-25 | House | Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 04-30-19. |
2019-04-25 | House | Reported from Conference Committee (Conf Com. Rep. No. 65) as amended in (CD 1). |
2019-04-25 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice (as amended CD 1) 04-30-19. |
2019-04-25 | Senate | Reported from Conference Committee as amended CD 1 (Conf. Com. Rep. No. 65). |
2019-04-25 | House | The Conference Committee recommends that the measure be Passed, with Amendments. The votes were as follows: 3 Ayes: Representative(s) Takumi, C. Lee, Matsumoto; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2019-04-25 | Senate | The Conference committee recommends that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes of the Senate Conference Managers were as follows: 2 Aye(s): Senator(s) Baker, K. Rhoads; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Fevella. |
2019-04-24 | Senate | Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-25-19 2:30PM in conference room 229. |
2019-04-22 | Senate | Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-24-19 2:30PM in conference room 229. |
2019-04-18 | House | Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 918). |
2019-04-18 | House | Bill scheduled for Conference Committee Meeting on Monday, 04-22-19 2:30PM in conference room 229. |
2019-04-18 | Senate | Senate Conferees Appointed: Baker Chair; K. Rhoads Co-Chair; Fevella. |
2019-04-15 | Senate | Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 809). |
2019-04-15 | House | House Conferees Appointed: Takumi, C. Lee Co-Chairs; Matsumoto. |
2019-04-11 | House | Received notice of disagreement (Sen. Com. No. 893). |
2019-04-11 | Senate | Senate disagrees with House amendments. |
2019-04-11 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 742). |
2019-04-09 | House | Passed Third Reading as amended in HD 2 with none voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Har, Say voting no (2) and none excused (0). Transmitted to Senate. |
2019-04-05 | House | Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 04-09-19. |
2019-04-05 | House | Reported from JUD (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2200) as amended in HD 2, recommending passage on Third Reading. |
2019-04-05 | House | The committees on JUD recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 10 Ayes: Representative(s) C. Lee, San Buenaventura, Brower, Creagan, Lowen, McKelvey, Morikawa, Takayama, Yamane, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: none; 1 Noes: Representative(s) Say; and Excused: none. |
2019-04-04 | House | Bill scheduled for decision making on Friday, 04-05-19 2:00PM in conference room 325. |
2019-04-04 | House | The committee(s) on JUD recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until 04-05-19 at 2:00PM. |
2019-04-03 | House | Bill scheduled for decision making on Thursday, 04-04-19 2:00PM in conference room 325. |
2019-04-03 | House | The committee(s) on JUD recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until 04-04-19 at 2:00PM. |
2019-04-02 | House | Bill scheduled for decision making on Wednesday, 04-03-19 2:05PM in conference room 325. |
2019-04-02 | House | The committee(sThe committee(s) on JUD recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until 04-03-19 2:05pm. |
2019-03-29 | House | Bill scheduled for decision making on Tuesday, 04-02-19 2:00PM in conference room 325. |
2019-03-29 | House | The committee(s) on JUD recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until 04-02-19 at 2:00pm. |
2019-03-27 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by JUD on Friday, 03-29-19 2:05PM in House conference room 325. |
2019-03-19 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on JUD with Representative(s) San Buenaventura voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Belatti, Quinlan, Yamane excused (3). |
2019-03-19 | House | Reported from CPC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1404) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to JUD. |
2019-03-12 | House | The committees on CPC recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 9 Ayes: Representative(s) Takumi, Aquino, Cabanilla Arakawa, Cachola, Har, Kong, Mizuno, Onishi, Matsumoto; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Ichiyama, Belatti. |
2019-03-08 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by CPC on Tuesday, 03-12-19 2:00PM in House conference room 329. |
2019-03-07 | House | Referred to CPC, JUD, referral sheet 27 |
2019-03-07 | House | Pass First Reading |
2019-03-05 | House | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 182) in amended form (SD 1). |
2019-03-05 | Senate | Report Adopted; Passed Third Reading. Ayes, 24; Aye(s) with reservations: none. Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 1 (Senator(s) Harimoto). Transmitted to House. |
2019-03-01 | Senate | Deferred until 03-05-19. |
2019-02-28 | Senate | One Day Notice 03-01-19. |
2019-02-28 | Senate | Reported from JDC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 812) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading. |
2019-02-20 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDC recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in JDC were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) K. Rhoads, Wakai, Gabbard, Kim; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Fevella. |
2019-02-15 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDC will hold a public decision making on 02-20-19 10:30AM in conference room 016. |
2019-02-07 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to JDC. |
2019-02-07 | Senate | Reported from CPH (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 98) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to JDC. |
2019-01-31 | Senate | The committee(s) on CPH recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in CPH were as follows: 7 Aye(s): Senator(s) Baker, S. Chang, J.Keohokalole, Nishihara, Ruderman, L. Thielen, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2019-01-25 | Senate | The committee(s) on CPH has scheduled a public hearing on 01-31-19 9:30AM in conference room 229. |
2019-01-24 | Senate | Referred to CPH, JDC. |
2019-01-22 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2019-01-18 | Senate | Introduced. |