HI SB556 | 2019 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future SB556
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on January 18 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-07 - The committee on PSM deferred the measure.
Pending: Senate Public Safety, Intergovernmental and Military Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 18 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-07 - The committee on PSM deferred the measure.
Pending: Senate Public Safety, Intergovernmental and Military Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Adds the requirement to notify the Terrorist Screening Center administered by the Federal Bureau of Investigation to the gun permit application background check.
Title
Relating To Firearms.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-07 | Senate | The committee on PSM deferred the measure. |
2019-02-01 | Senate | The committee(s) on PSM has scheduled a public hearing on 02-07-19 1:15PM in conference room 229. |
2019-01-24 | Senate | Referred to PSM, JDC. |
2019-01-22 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2019-01-18 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
SB556 (Carry Over) 2019-02-07 - The committee on PSM deferred the measure.
HB1206 (Same As) 2019-01-28 - Referred to PVM, JUD, referral sheet 6
HB1206 (Same As) 2019-01-28 - Referred to PVM, JUD, referral sheet 6
Subjects
Firearms and Ammunition
Gun Permit Application Background Check
Terrorist Screening Database
Terrorist Watch List
Gun Permit Application Background Check
Terrorist Screening Database
Terrorist Watch List
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=SB&billnumber=556&year=2019 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2019/bills/SB556_.HTM |