HI SB558 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on April 18 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-22 - Act 011, 04/17/2019 (Gov. Msg. No. 1112).
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Allows parties to a marriage or civil union to choose any middle or last name to use upon the marriage or civil union.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating To Names.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-22SenateAct 011, 04/17/2019 (Gov. Msg. No. 1112).
2019-04-18HouseAct 011, on 04/17/2019 (Gov. Msg. No. 1112).
2019-04-01SenateEnrolled to Governor.
2019-04-01SenateReceived from House (Hse. Com. No. 519).
2019-03-29HousePassed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) DeCoite, Hashem, Say, Tokioka excused (4). Transmitted to Senate.
2019-03-28HousePassed Second Reading; placed on the calendar for Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Cabanilla Arakawa, C. Lee excused (2).
2019-03-28HouseReported from JUD (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1904), recommending passage on Second Reading and placement on the calendar for Third Reading.
2019-03-15HouseThe committees on JUD recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 10 Ayes: Representative(s) C. Lee, San Buenaventura, Brower, Creagan, Lowen, Morikawa, Say, Takayama, Yamane, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) McKelvey.
2019-03-14HouseBill scheduled for decision making on Friday, 03-15-19 2:00PM in conference room 325.
2019-03-14HouseThe committee(s) on JUD recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until 03-15-19 at 2:00pm.
2019-03-12HouseBill scheduled to be heard by JUD on Thursday, 03-14-19 2:00PM in House conference room 325.
2019-03-07HouseReferred to JUD, referral sheet 27
2019-03-05HousePass First Reading
2019-03-01HouseReceived from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 20).
2019-03-01SenatePassed Third Reading. Ayes, 24; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 1 (Senator(s) Harimoto). Transmitted to House.
2019-02-28SenateOne Day Notice 03-01-19.
2019-02-28SenateReport adopted; Passed Second Reading.
2019-02-28SenateReported from JDC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 772) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading and placement on the calendar for Third Reading.
2019-02-22SenateThe committee(s) on JDC recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in JDC were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) K. Rhoads, Gabbard, Kim; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Wakai, Fevella.
2019-02-14SenateThe committee(s) on JDC deferred the measure until 02-22-19 9:30AM in conference room 016.
2019-02-11SenateThe committee(s) on JDC has scheduled a public hearing on 02-14-19 9:30AM in conference room 016.
2019-01-24SenateReferred to JDC.
2019-01-22SenatePassed First Reading.
2019-01-18SenateIntroduced.

Subjects


Hawaii State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback