HI SB559 | 2019 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future SB559
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Introduced on January 18 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-01-24 - Referred to WTL, WAM.
Pending: Senate Water and Land Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 18 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-01-24 - Referred to WTL, WAM.
Pending: Senate Water and Land Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requires moorage fees for non-commercial mooring use permits at state small boat harbors to be determined by appraisal and set at fair market value. Establishes effective date for state small boat harbor moorage fee increases. Effective August 1, 2019.
Title
Relating To State Small Boat Harbors.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-24 | Senate | Referred to WTL, WAM. |
2019-01-22 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2019-01-18 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
SB559 (Carry Over) 2019-01-24 - Referred to WTL, WAM.
HB354 (Same As) 2019-01-22 - Referred to WLH/TRN, FIN, referral sheet 3
HB354 (Same As) 2019-01-22 - Referred to WLH/TRN, FIN, referral sheet 3
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=SB&billnumber=559&year=2019 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2019/bills/SB559_.HTM |