HI SB567 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Enrolled on May 1 2019 - 75% progression
Action: 2019-05-06 - Enrolled to Governor.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Appropriates funds for program ID HTH420 for the Department of Health to contract for legal assistance with petitions for assisted community treatment and related court proceedings. (CD1)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Related To Mental Health Treatment.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-06SenateEnrolled to Governor.
2019-05-02SenateReceived notice of passage on Final Reading in House (Hse. Com. No. 883).
2019-05-01HouseReceived notice of Final Reading (Sen. Com. No. 968).
2019-04-30SenatePassed Final Reading, as amended (CD 1). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . 0 No(es): none. 0 Excused: none.
2019-04-30HousePassed Final Reading as amended in CD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0).
2019-04-26HouseForty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 04-30-19.
2019-04-26HouseReported from Conference Committee (Conf Com. Rep. No. 166) as amended in (CD 1).
2019-04-26Senate48 Hrs. Notice (as amended CD 1) 04-30-19.
2019-04-26SenateReported from Conference Committee as amended CD 1 (Conf. Com. Rep. No. 166).
2019-04-26HouseThe Conference Committee recommends that the measure be Passed, with Amendments. The votes were as follows: 4 Ayes: Representative(s) Mizuno, San Buenaventura, B. Kobayashi, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 0 Excused: none.
2019-04-26SenateThe Conference committee recommends that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes of the Senate Conference Managers were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Baker, K. Rhoads, English; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Nishihara, Fevella.
2019-04-26SenateConference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-26-19 2:45PM in conference room 229.
2019-04-25SenateConference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-26-19 9:30AM in conference room 229.
2019-04-24SenateConference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-25-19 9:30AM in conference room 229.
2019-04-23SenateConference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-24-19 9:30AM in conference room 229.
2019-04-22SenateConference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-23-19 9:30AM in conference room 229.
2019-04-18SenateConference committee meeting scheduled for 04-22-19 9:30AM in conference room 229.
2019-04-16HouseReceived notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 903).
2019-04-16SenateSenate Conferees Appointed: Baker Chair; K. Rhoads, English Co-Chairs; Nishihara, Fevella.
2019-04-15SenateReceived notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 809).
2019-04-15HouseHouse Conferees Appointed: Mizuno, San Buenaventura, B. Kobayashi Co-Chairs; Ward.
2019-04-11HouseReceived notice of disagreement (Sen. Com. No. 893).
2019-04-11SenateSenate disagrees with House amendments.
2019-04-11SenateReceived from House (Hse. Com. No. 744).
2019-04-09HousePassed Third Reading with Representative(s) Okimoto voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0). Transmitted to Senate.
2019-04-05HouseReported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2166), recommending passage on Third Reading.
2019-04-03HouseThe committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 13 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Cullen, Eli, Gates, Hashimoto, Kitagawa, B. Kobayashi, Matayoshi, Nakamura, Todd, Wildberger, Yamashita, McDermott; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Holt, Nishimoto.
2019-04-01HouseBill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Wednesday, 04-03-19 2:00PM in House conference room 308.
2019-03-22HouseReport adopted. referred to the committee(s) on FIN as amended in HD 2 with Representative(s) Okimoto voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Quinlan, Yamane excused (2).
2019-03-22HouseReported from JUD (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1692) as amended in HD 2, recommending referral to FIN.
2019-03-21HouseThe committees on JUD recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 8 Ayes: Representative(s) C. Lee, San Buenaventura, Brower, Creagan, McKelvey, Morikawa, Takayama, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: none; 1 Noes: Representative(s) Say; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Lowen, Yamane.
2019-03-19HouseBill scheduled for decision making on Thursday, 03-21-19 2:00PM in conference room 325.
2019-03-19HouseThe committee(s) on JUD recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until 03-21-19.
2019-03-18HouseBill scheduled for decision making on Tuesday, 03-19-19 2:00PM in conference room 325.
2019-03-18HouseThe committee(s) on JUD recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until 03-19-19.
2019-03-15HouseBill scheduled to be heard by JUD on Monday, 03-18-19 2:05PM in House conference room 325.
2019-03-15HousePassed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on JUD with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) McKelvey, Nakamura, Quinlan, Takumi excused (4).
2019-03-15HouseReported from HLT (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1374) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to JUD.
2019-03-14HouseThe committees on HLT recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 6 Ayes: Representative(s) Mizuno, B. Kobayashi, Belatti, Nakamura, San Buenaventura, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; 1 Noes: Representative(s) Say; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Tokioka.
2019-03-11HouseBill scheduled to be heard by HLT on Thursday, 03-14-19 9:00AM in House conference room 329.
2019-03-07HouseReferred to HLT, JUD, FIN, referral sheet 27
2019-03-07HousePass First Reading
2019-03-05HouseReceived from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 190) in amended form (SD 2).
2019-03-05SenateReport adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). Ayes, 24; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 1 (Senator(s) Harimoto). Transmitted to House.
2019-03-01Senate48 Hrs. Notice 03-05-19.
2019-03-01SenateReported from JDC/WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1147) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 2).
2019-02-26SenateThe committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 9 Aye(s): Senator(s) Dela Cruz, English, Harimoto, Kanuha, Kidani, Moriwaki, Shimabukuro, Taniguchi, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 4 Excused: Senator(s) Keith-Agaran, Inouye, K. Kahele, Riviere.
2019-02-26SenateThe committee(s) on JDC recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in JDC were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) K. Rhoads, Wakai, Gabbard, Kim, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none.
2019-02-21SenateThe committee(s) on JDC/WAM will hold a public decision making on 02-26-19 10:00AM in conference room 211.
2019-02-15SenateReport adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to JDC/WAM.
2019-02-15SenateReported from CPH (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 591) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to JDC/WAM.
2019-02-13SenateThe committee(s) on CPH recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in CPH were as follows: 6 Aye(s): Senator(s) Baker, S. Chang, Nishihara, Ruderman, L. Thielen, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) J.Keohokalole.
2019-02-06SenateThe committee(s) on CPH has scheduled a public hearing on 02-13-19 9:10AM in conference room 229.
2019-01-24SenateReferred to CPH, JDC/WAM.
2019-01-22SenatePassed First Reading.
2019-01-18SenateIntroduced.

Same As/Similar To

HB1240 (Same As) 2019-01-28 - Referred to HLT, JUD, FIN, referral sheet 6

Subjects


Hawaii State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback