HI SB569 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Vetoed on July 13 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-07-14 - Vetoed on 07/13/2015 - Returned from the Governor without approval (Gov. Msg. No. 1333).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on July 13 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-07-14 - Vetoed on 07/13/2015 - Returned from the Governor without approval (Gov. Msg. No. 1333).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Increases the monetary threshold to $750 with respect to property or services for theft in the second degree. (CD1)
Title
Theft in the Second Degree; Value of Property or Services
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-07-14 | Senate | Vetoed on 07/13/2015 - Returned from the Governor without approval (Gov. Msg. No. 1333). |
2015-07-13 | House | Vetoed (Gov. Msg. No. 1333). |
2015-06-29 | House | Notice of intent to veto (Gov. Msg. No. 1243) |
2015-06-29 | Senate | Notice of Intent to veto dated 06/29/2015 (Gov. Msg. No. 1243) |
2015-05-08 | Senate | Enrolled to Governor. |
2015-05-07 | Senate | Received notice of passage on Final Reading in House (Hse. Com. No. 680). |
2015-05-05 | House | Received notice of Final Reading (Sen. Com. No. 699). |
2015-05-05 | House | Passed Final Reading as amended in CD 1 with Representative(s) McKelvey voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Aquino, Cullen, Fukumoto Chang, Har, Johanson, Kawakami, Kong, Matsumoto, McDermott, Ohno, Pouha, Thielen, Tokioka, Tupola, Ward, Yamane voting no (16) and none excused (0). |
2015-05-05 | Senate | Passed Final Reading, as amended (CD 1). 23 Aye(s); Aye(s) with reservations: none . 2 No(es): Senator(s) Slom, L. Thielen. 0 Excused: none. |
2015-04-30 | House | Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday 05-05-15. |
2015-04-30 | House | Reported from Conference Committee (Conf Com. Rep. No. 25) as amended in (CD 1). |
2015-04-30 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice (as amended CD 1) 05-05-15. |
2015-04-30 | Senate | Reported from Conference Committee as amended CD 1 (Conf. Com. Rep. No. 25). |
2015-04-28 | House | The Conference Committee recommends that the measure be Passed, with Amendments. The votes were as follows: 3 Ayes: Representative(s) Rhoads, San Buenaventura, Takayama; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2015-04-28 | Senate | The Conference committee recommends that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes of the Senate Conference Managers were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Keith-Agaran, Espero, Ihara, Shimabukuro, L. Thielen; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2015-04-23 | Senate | Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-28-15 2:00PM in conference room 325. |
2015-04-22 | Senate | Conference committee meeting scheduled for 04-23-15 2:02PM in conference room 325. |
2015-04-21 | Senate | Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 624). |
2015-04-20 | House | Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 642). |
2015-04-20 | House | House Conferees Appointed: Rhoads Chair; San Buenaventura, Takayama. |
2015-04-20 | Senate | Senate Conferees Appointed: Keith-Agaran Chair; Espero, Ihara, Shimabukuro, L. Thielen. |
2015-04-16 | House | Received notice of disagreement (Sen. Com. No. 638). |
2015-04-16 | Senate | Senate disagrees with House amendments. |
2015-04-14 | Senate | Deferred until 04-16-15. |
2015-04-14 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 446). |
2015-04-10 | House | Passed Third Reading with Representative(s) Johanson, Keohokalole voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Aquino, Choy, Cullen, DeCoite, Fukumoto Chang, Har, Kawakami, Kong, Matsumoto, McDermott, Pouha, Thielen, Tupola, Ward, Yamane voting no (15) and Representative(s) LoPresti, McKelvey, Oshiro, Say, Tokioka excused (5). Transmitted to Senate. |
2015-04-08 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1; placed on the calendar for Third Reading with Representative(s) Aquino, Cullen, Yamane voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) DeCoite, Fukumoto Chang, Har, Kawakami, Matsumoto, McDermott, McKelvey, Pouha, Thielen, Tokioka, Tupola voting no (11) and Representative(s) Oshiro, Ward excused (2). |
2015-04-08 | House | Reported from JUD (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1389) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and placement on the calendar for Third Reading. |
2015-03-31 | House | The committees on JUD recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 10 Ayes: Representative(s) Rhoads, Belatti, Brower, Creagan, Hashem, C. Lee, Morikawa, Nakashima, Takayama, Woodson; Ayes with reservations: none; 3 Noes: Representative(s) Kawakami, McDermott, Thielen; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) San Buenaventura. |
2015-03-31 | House | Broadcast of hearing/briefing available. See: www.capitoltv.org |
2015-03-27 | House | Bill scheduled for decision-making on Tuesday 03-31-15, at 2:10PM in conference room 325. |
2015-03-27 | House | The committee(s) on JUD recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until 03-31-15 at 2:10 PM in room 325. |
2015-03-27 | House | Broadcast of hearing/briefing available. See: www.capitoltv.org |
2015-03-20 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by JUD on Friday, 03-27-15 3:00PM in House conference room 325. |
2015-03-12 | House | Referred to JUD, referral sheet 30 |
2015-03-12 | House | Pass First Reading |
2015-03-10 | House | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 159) in amended form (SD 1). |
2015-03-10 | Senate | Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 1). Ayes, 23; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) L. Thielen . Noes, 1 (Senator(s) Slom). Excused, 1 (Senator(s) Shimabukuro). Transmitted to House. |
2015-03-05 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice 03-10-15. |
2015-03-05 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1). |
2015-03-05 | Senate | Reported from JDL (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 609) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and placement on the calendar for Third Reading. |
2015-02-23 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDL recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in JDL were as follows: 6 Aye(s): Senator(s) Keith-Agaran, Shimabukuro, Espero, Gabbard, Ihara, L. Thielen; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 1 No(es): Senator(s) Slom; and 0 Excused: none. |
2015-02-19 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDL has scheduled a public hearing on 02-23-15 9:00AM in conference room 016. |
2015-01-26 | Senate | Referred to JDL. |
2015-01-26 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2015-01-23 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
HB366 (Same As) 2015-01-26 - Referred to JUD, referral sheet 1