HI SB569 | 2019 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future SB569
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 5 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-07 - Referred to HSH/LAB, JUD, FIN, referral sheet 27
Pending: House Human Services & Homelessness Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 5 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-07 - Referred to HSH/LAB, JUD, FIN, referral sheet 27
Pending: House Human Services & Homelessness Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Includes programs and activities that also receive federal financial assistance within the meaning of programs and activities receiving state financial assistance. Reiterates the legislature's intent of ensuring non-discriminatory access to State financially assisted programs, as it relates to the Hawaii civil rights commission's jurisdiction. Excludes claims cognizable under the Individuals with Disabilities Education Act from the Hawaii civil rights commission's jurisdiction. (SD2)
Title
Relating To The Hawaii Civil Rights Commission.
Sponsors
Sen. Karl Rhoads [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-07 | House | Referred to HSH/LAB, JUD, FIN, referral sheet 27 |
2019-03-07 | House | Pass First Reading |
2019-03-05 | House | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 191) in amended form (SD 2). |
2019-03-05 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). Ayes, 24; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 1 (Senator(s) Harimoto). Transmitted to House. |
2019-03-01 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice 03-05-19. |
2019-03-01 | Senate | Reported from LCA/JDC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1113) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). |
2019-02-26 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDC recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in JDC were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) K. Rhoads, Kim, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Wakai, Gabbard. |
2019-02-26 | Senate | The committee(s) on LCA recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in LCA were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Taniguchi, S. Chang, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Ihara, Gabbard. |
2019-02-21 | Senate | The committee(s) on LCA/JDC has scheduled a public hearing on 02-26-19 2:45PM in conference room 224. |
2019-02-11 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to LCA/JDC. |
2019-02-11 | Senate | Reported from HMS (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 179) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to LCA/JDC. |
2019-02-04 | Senate | The committee(s) on HMS recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in HMS were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Ruderman, K. Rhoads, Ihara, Riviere, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2019-02-01 | Senate | The committee(s) on HMS has scheduled a public hearing on 02-04-19 3:10PM in conference room 016. |
2019-01-28 | Senate | Re-Referred to HMS, LCA/JDC. |
2019-01-24 | Senate | Referred to HMS, CPH/JDC. |
2019-01-22 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2019-01-18 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
SB569 (Carry Over) 2019-03-07 - Referred to HSH/LAB, JUD, FIN, referral sheet 27
Subjects
Civil Rights
Disability
Discrimination
Programs and Activities Receiving State Financial Assistance
State Agencies and Programs
Disability
Discrimination
Programs and Activities Receiving State Financial Assistance
State Agencies and Programs