HI SB576 | 2019 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future SB576
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Introduced on January 18 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-05 - The committee on LCA deferred the measure.
Pending: Senate Labor, Culture and the Arts Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 18 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-05 - The committee on LCA deferred the measure.
Pending: Senate Labor, Culture and the Arts Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Permits claimants for unemployment benefits to report in person or via electronic communication. Prohibits denial of unemployment insurance benefits if a claimant is out of the State with access to facilities and methods that are prevailing or customarily used by persons to work remotely in the claimant's occupation.
Title
Relating To Employment Security.
Sponsors
Sen. Gil Keith-agaran [D] | Sen. Rosalyn Baker [D] | Sen. Kalani English [D] | Sen. Mike Gabbard [D] |
Sen. Lorraine Inouye [D] | Sen. Clarence Nishihara [D] | Sen. Maile Shimabukuro [D] | Sen. Brian Taniguchi [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-05 | Senate | The committee on LCA deferred the measure. |
2019-02-01 | Senate | The committee(s) on LCA has scheduled a public hearing on 02-05-19 2:45PM in conference room 224. |
2019-01-24 | Senate | Referred to LCA, WAM. |
2019-01-22 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2019-01-18 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
SB576 (Carry Over) 2019-02-05 - The committee on LCA deferred the measure.
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=SB&billnumber=576&year=2019 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2019/bills/SB576_.HTM |