HI SB583 | 2019 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future SB583
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Introduced on January 18 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-12 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to WAM.
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 18 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-12 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to WAM.
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Beginning with the 2019-2021 fiscal year, reduces the percentage from 6.5 per cent to 5.0 per cent of the total department of education's operating budget that can be expended for the department's administrative expenditures. Increases the per cent of appropriations for the total budget of the department that principals can expend from seventy per cent to seventy-five per cent.
Title
Relating To Education.
Sponsors
Sen. Gil Keith-agaran [D] | Sen. Kalani English [D] | Sen. Glenn Wakai [D] | Sen. Donovan Cruz [D] |
Sen. Dru Kanuha [D] | Sen. Donna Kim [D] | Sen. Clarence Nishihara [D] | Sen. Maile Shimabukuro [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-12 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to WAM. |
2019-02-12 | Senate | Reported from EDU (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 235) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading and referral to WAM. |
2019-02-08 | Senate | The committee(s) on EDU recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in EDU were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Kidani, Kim, Dela Cruz, Kanuha, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2019-02-05 | Senate | The committee(s) on EDU has scheduled a public hearing on 02-08-19 2:55PM in conference room 229. |
2019-01-24 | Senate | Referred to EDU, WAM. |
2019-01-22 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2019-01-18 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
SB583 (Carry Over) 2019-02-12 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to WAM.
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=SB&billnumber=583&year=2019 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2019/bills/SB583_.HTM |