HI SB593 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on July 2 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-07-02 - Act 200, 6/26/2013 (Gov. Msg. No. 1303).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on July 2 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-07-02 - Act 200, 6/26/2013 (Gov. Msg. No. 1303).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Expands livestock feed subsidies to include milking goats, goats raised for meat, sheep, lambs, fish, and crustaceans. Appropriates funds. (CD1)
Title
Agriculture; Livestock Industry; Appropriation ($)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-07-02 | Senate | Act 200, 6/26/2013 (Gov. Msg. No. 1303). |
2013-07-02 | House | Act 200, on 6/26/2013 (Gov. Msg. No. 1303). |
2013-05-07 | Senate | Enrolled to Governor. |
2013-05-02 | Senate | Received notice of passage on Final Reading in House (Hse. Com. No. 761). |
2013-05-01 | House | Received notice of Final Reading (Sen. Com. No. 755). |
2013-04-30 | House | Passed Final Reading as amended in CD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0). |
2013-04-30 | Senate | Passed Final Reading, as amended (CD 1). 22 Aye(s); Aye(s) with reservations: none . 2 No(es): Senator(s) Wakai, Slom. 1 Excused: Senator(s) Ige. |
2013-04-26 | House | Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 04-30-13. |
2013-04-26 | House | Reported from Conference Committee (Conf Com. Rep. No. 126) as amended in (CD 1). |
2013-04-26 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice (as amended CD 1) 04-30-13. |
2013-04-26 | Senate | Reported from Conference Committee as amended CD 1 (Conf. Com. Rep. No. 126). |
2013-04-26 | House | The Conference Committee recommends that the measure be Passed, with Amendments. The votes were as follows: 3 Ayes: Representative(s) Wooley, Onishi, Cheape; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Takayama. |
2013-04-26 | Senate | The Conference committee recommends that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes of the Senate Conference Managers were as follows: 2 Aye(s): Senator(s) Nishihara, Kouchi; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Ige. |
2013-04-26 | Senate | Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-26-13 3:30PM in conference room 224. |
2013-04-25 | Senate | Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-26-13 10:30AM in conference room 224. |
2013-04-25 | Senate | Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-25-13 3:30PM in conference room 224. |
2013-04-24 | Senate | Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-25-13 10:30AM in conference room 224. |
2013-04-23 | Senate | Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-24-13 3:35PM in conference room 224. |
2013-04-22 | Senate | Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-23-13 11:00AM in conference room 224. |
2013-04-19 | Senate | Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-22-13 3:30PM in conference room 224. |
2013-04-18 | House | Received notice of change in Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 709). |
2013-04-18 | Senate | Senator(s) Ige discharged as (Co-) Chair; Added as conferee. |
2013-04-17 | Senate | Conference committee meeting scheduled for 04-18-13 3:30PM in conference room 224. |
2013-04-16 | Senate | Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 699). |
2013-04-15 | House | House conferees appointed: Wooley, Onishi Co-Chairs; Takayama, Cheape. |
2013-04-15 | House | Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 692). |
2013-04-15 | Senate | Senate Conferees appointed: Nishihara, Chair; Ige, Kouchi, Co-Chair(s); . |
2013-04-11 | House | Received notice of disagreement (Sen. Com. No. 608). |
2013-04-11 | Senate | Senate disagrees with House amendments. |
2013-04-09 | Senate | Deferred until 04-11-13. |
2013-04-05 | Senate | Deferred until 04-09-13. |
2013-04-05 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 441). |
2013-04-04 | House | Passed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Cabanilla excused (1). Transmitted to Senate. |
2013-04-04 | House | Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1406), recommending passage on Third Reading. |
2013-03-28 | House | The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 15 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Nishimoto, Johanson, Cullen, Hashem, Ing, Jordan, Kobayashi, Lowen, Morikawa, Onishi, Takayama, Yamashita, Fukumoto, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Tokioka, Woodson. |
2013-03-25 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Thursday, 03-28-13 2:00PM in House conference room 308. |
2013-03-21 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Belatti, Say excused (2). |
2013-03-21 | House | Reported from AGR (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1065) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN. |
2013-03-14 | House | The committees on AGR recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 11 Ayes: Representative(s) Wooley, Onishi, Brower, Cachola, Choy, Ohno, Takayama, Tokioka, Tsuji, Cheape, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none. |
2013-03-11 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by AGR on Thursday, 03-14-13 9:30AM in House conference room 312. |
2013-03-07 | House | Referred to AGR, FIN, referral sheet 30 |
2013-03-07 | House | Pass First Reading |
2013-03-05 | House | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 173) in amended form (SD 2). |
2013-03-05 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). Ayes, 23; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 2 (Senator(s) Wakai, Slom). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House. |
2013-03-01 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice 03-05-13. |
2013-03-01 | Senate | Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 738) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). |
2013-02-21 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 13 Aye(s): Senator(s) Ige, Kidani, Chun Oakland, Dela Cruz, English, Espero, Kahele, Keith-Agaran, Kouchi, Ruderman, L. Thielen, Tokuda; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Slom ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2013-02-14 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM deferred the measure until 02-21-13 9:15AM in conference room 211. |
2013-02-11 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 02-14-13 9:05AM in conference room 211. |
2013-02-01 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM. |
2013-02-01 | Senate | Reported from AGL (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 20) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM. |
2013-01-29 | Senate | The committee(s) on AGL recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in AGL were as follows: 6 Aye(s): Senator(s) Nishihara, Kouchi, Dela Cruz, English; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) L. Thielen, Wakai ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Slom. |
2013-01-23 | Senate | The committee(s) on AGL has scheduled a public hearing on 01-29-13 2:45PM in conference room 229. |
2013-01-22 | Senate | Referred to AGL, WAM. |
2013-01-22 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2013-01-18 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
HB487 (Same As) 2013-04-26 - Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Friday, 04-26-13 at 5:45PM in Conference Room 224.