HI SB600 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Enrolled on April 18 2019 - 75% progression
Action: 2019-04-18 - Enrolled to Governor.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Prohibits individuals who are less than 21 years of age from bringing or causing to be brought into the State any firearm. (SB600 HD2)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating To Firearms.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-18SenateEnrolled to Governor.
2019-04-18HouseReceived notice of reconsideration, Senate agreement, and Final Reading (Sen. Com. No. 914).
2019-04-18SenatePassed Final Reading. Ayes, 21; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Kidani, Taniguchi . 4 No(es): Senator(s) Fevella, Gabbard, Harimoto, Riviere. 0 Excused: none.
2019-04-17SenateOne Day Notice 04-18-19.
2019-04-17SenateSenate agrees with House amendments. Placed on the calendar for Final Reading on 04-18-19.
2019-04-17SenateReconsideration of action taken on 04-05-19 in disagreeing to the House amendments.
2019-04-15SenateReceived notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 809).
2019-04-15HouseHouse Conferees Appointed: Takayama, C. Lee Co-Chairs; Thielen.
2019-04-05HouseReceived notice of disagreement (Sen. Com. No. 685).
2019-04-05SenateSenate disagrees with House amendments.
2019-04-05SenateReceived from House (Hse. Com. No. 584).
2019-04-04HousePassed Third Reading as amended in HD 2 with none voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Aquino, Cullen, DeCoite, Har, Kong, Matsumoto, McDermott, Okimoto, Say, Tokioka, Ward, Yamane voting no (12) and Representative(s) Nishimoto, Quinlan excused (2). Transmitted to Senate.
2019-04-02HouseForty-eight (48) hours notice Thursday, 04-04-19.
2019-04-02HouseReported from JUD (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1941) as amended in HD 2, recommending passage on Third Reading.
2019-03-27HouseThe committees on JUD recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 9 Ayes: Representative(s) C. Lee, San Buenaventura, Brower, Lowen, Morikawa, Takayama, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Say, Yamane; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Creagan, McKelvey.
2019-03-25HouseBill scheduled for decision making on Wednesday, 03-27-19 2:00PM in conference room 325.
2019-03-25HouseThe committee(s) on JUD recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until 03-27-19 2:00PM.
2019-03-22HouseBill scheduled to be heard by JUD on Monday, 03-25-19 2:00PM in House conference room 325.
2019-03-19HousePassed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on JUD with Representative(s) DeCoite, Har, Matsumoto, Okimoto, Tokioka voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) McDermott, Ward voting no (2) and Representative(s) Belatti, Quinlan, Yamane excused (3).
2019-03-19HouseReported from PVM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1430) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to JUD.
2019-03-15HouseThe committees on PVM recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 6 Ayes: Representative(s) Takayama, Gates, D. Kobayashi, Nishimoto, Ohno; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Kong; 1 Noes: Representative(s) McDermott; and Excused: none.
2019-03-13HouseBill scheduled to be heard by PVM on Friday, 03-15-19 10:00AM in House conference room 430.
2019-03-07HouseReferred to PVM, JUD, referral sheet 27
2019-03-07HousePass First Reading
2019-03-05HouseReceived from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 197).
2019-03-05SenateReport Adopted; Passed Third Reading. Ayes, 21; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) K. Kahele, Kidani. Noes, 3 (Senator(s) Fevella, Gabbard, Riviere). Excused, 1 (Senator(s) Harimoto). Transmitted to House.
2019-03-01SenateDeferred until 03-05-19.
2019-02-28SenateOne Day Notice 03-01-19.
2019-02-28SenateReported from JDC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 817) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading.
2019-02-22SenateThe committee(s) on JDC recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in JDC were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) K. Rhoads, Wakai, Kim; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 1 No(es): Senator(s) Gabbard; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Fevella.
2019-02-15SenateThe committee(s) on JDC will hold a public decision making on 02-22-19 9:00AM in conference room 016.
2019-02-15SenateReport adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to JDC.
2019-02-15SenateReported from PSM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 430) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading and referral to JDC.
2019-02-07SenateThe committee(s) on PSM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in PSM were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Nishihara, Wakai, Baker, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Harimoto ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none.
2019-02-01SenateThe committee(s) on PSM has scheduled a public hearing on 02-07-19 1:15PM in conference room 229.
2019-01-24SenateReferred to PSM, JDC.
2019-01-22SenatePassed First Reading.
2019-01-18SenateIntroduced.

Subjects


Hawaii State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback